Tesla, Inc. v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roy K Altman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21278 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A
|
|
Plaintiff
Tesla, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 04/24 2:45 PM
ORDER Granting16 Motion for Extension of the Sealed Order Granting Entry of Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (cds) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 04/24 2:48 PM
Reset Deadlines/Hearings ( Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/13/2024 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman.), ( Responses due by 5/3/2024., Replies due by 5/10/2024.). PER DE#17 (cds) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time Continue
Tue 04/23 5:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time of Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION to Continue April 26, 2024 Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Tesla, Inc.. Responses due by 5/7/2024.(Sobrado, Javier) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Javier Sobrado, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 12:43 PM
Summons Issued as to The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A. (ls) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Fri 04/19 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Tesla, Inc. (Sobrado, Javier) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s), Proposed | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Mon 04/15 11:47 AM
ORDER Granting5 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (cds) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Motion to Seal (Public)
Thu 04/11 11:37 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Schedule A to the Complaint per Local Rule 5.4 by Tesla, Inc.. (Sobrado, Javier) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 04/08 12:38 PM
ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/8/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
Form AO 120/121
Fri 04/05 3:43 PM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (cds) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/05 3:37 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 1:51 PM
COMPLAINT against The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17426212, filed by Tesla, Inc..(Sobrado, Javier) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |