Cohan v. 1380 North Federal Highway, LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Aileen M Cannon |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80412 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
1380 North Federal Highway, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Mon 04/29 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 4:13 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. 1380 North Federal Highway, LLC served on 4/8/2024, response/answer due 4/29/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 1:45 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/05 2:21 PM
Summons Issued as to 1380 North Federal Highway, LLC. (amb) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/05 2:17 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 1:36 PM
COMPLAINT against 1380 North Federal Highway, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17426168, filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |