Giana v. Shein Distribution Corporation et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jed S Rakoff |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02599 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Roadget Business Pte., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shein Distribution Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Shein Technology LLC
|
|
Defendant
Shein US Services, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Alan Giana
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 04/29 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 5/30/2024, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:15 AM. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/29/2024) (ate) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 04/29 3:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/29/2024, without transcription or recording. Counsel for all parties was present. The deadline to answer or file a Rule 12 motion is extended to Friday, May 31, 2024. The Court will take up any request for a further extension at the telephonic initial pretrial conference. (Initial Conference set for 5/30/2024 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415.). (nmo) Modified on 4/29/2024 (nmo) |
||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 6:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew H. Schapiro on behalf of Shein Distribution Corp., Shein Technology LLC, Shein US Services, LLC..(Schapiro, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Tue 04/16 3:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Shein US Services, LLC on April 10, 2024. Service was accepted by Cathryne Velasquez. Document filed by Alan Giana..(Mullen, Wesley) |
|
17 | 17
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Tue 04/16 1:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Shein Technology LLC on April 10, 2024. Service was accepted by Cathryne Velasquez. Document filed by Alan Giana..(Mullen, Wesley) |
|
16 | 16
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Tue 04/16 1:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Shein Distribution Corp. on April 10, 2024. Service was accepted by Cathryne Velasquez. Document filed by Alan Giana..(Mullen, Wesley) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 12:45 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shein Distribution Corp.. (vf) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/08 2:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHEIN DISTRIBUTION CORP., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alan Giana..(Mullen, Wesley) |
|
13 | 13
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Mon 04/08 11:46 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 11:38 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shein Technology LLC..(pc) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 11:38 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shein US Services, LLC..(pc) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 11:37 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roadget Business Pte., Ltd...(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/08 10:57 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/08 10:58 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/08 10:59 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Mon 04/08 10:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Wesley Martin Mullen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Roadget Business Pte., Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/08 10:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Wesley Martin Mullen to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name does not exactly match Complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/05 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Solomon Nematzadeh on behalf of Alan Giana..(Nematzadeh, Justin) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/05 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Robert Fitzpatrick, III on behalf of Alan Giana..(Fitzpatrick, Vincent) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 2:16 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHEIN US SERVICES, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alan Giana..(Mullen, Wesley) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 2:14 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHEIN TECHNOLOGY LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alan Giana..(Mullen, Wesley) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 2:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ROADGET BUSINESS PTE., LTD. d/b/a SHEIN, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alan Giana..(Mullen, Wesley) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 2:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHEIN DISTRIBUTION CORPORATION, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alan Giana..(Mullen, Wesley) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/05 2:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mullen, Wesley) |
|
2 | 2
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Fri 04/05 2:05 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Mullen, Wesley) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 1:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Roadget Business Pte., Ltd., Shein Distribution Corporation, Shein Technology LLC, Shein US Services, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29180877)Document filed by Alan Giana..(Mullen, Wesley) |