Butler v. 3M Company et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah D Morrison |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01587 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:23-cv-02307 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 2:14 PM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55144 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arizant Healthcare, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda K. Butler
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2)
Tue 04/30 12:03 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendants 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Kloss, William) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/30 12:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Kloss, William) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/30 12:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant 3M Company. (Kloss, William) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 11:14 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting24 , as amended by30 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kelvin Adams as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/26/2024. (kk2) Modified text on 4/26/2024 (kk2) |
|
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 11:10 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting25 , as amended by28 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew S Yezierski as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/26/2024. (kk2) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/25 2:52 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Brenda K. Butler re24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9932543) of Kelvin Adams Texas Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing (Barrick, Penny) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service | ||
29 | 29
misc
Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2)
Thu 04/25 8:40 AM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Brenda K. Butler. (Barrick, Penny) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/25 8:33 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Brenda K. Butler re25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9932547) of Matthew S. Yezierski Texas Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing (Barrick, Penny) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 10:38 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting23 , as amended by26 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gabriel Assaad as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/24/2024. (kk2) Modified text on 4/24/2024 to correct typo (kk2) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/23 1:58 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Brenda K. Butler re23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9932541) of Gabriel Assaad Texas Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing (Barrick, Penny) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 5:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9932547) of Matthew S. Yezierski by Plaintiff Brenda K. Butler. (Barrick, Penny) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
24 | 24
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 5:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9932543) of Kelvin Adams by Plaintiff Brenda K. Butler. (Barrick, Penny) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
23 | 23
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 5:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9932541) of Gabriel Assaad by Plaintiff Brenda K. Butler. (Barrick, Penny) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 9:57 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting20 and21 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adria Conklin and Benjamin Hulse as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/18/2024. (kk2) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 4:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9925243) of Benjamin Hulse by Defendants 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Kloss, William) |
|
Att: 1 Illinois Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Minnesota Certificate of Good Standing | ||
20 | 20
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 4:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9925190) of Adria Conklin by Defendants 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Kloss, William) |
|
Att: 1 Arkansas Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Texas Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 11:26 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Danielle Morrison as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/16/2024. (kk2) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/15 5:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9920620) of Danielle Morrison by Defendants 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Kloss, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 5:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Aaron Tobias for Defendants 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (Tobias, Mitchell) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Darrell Kloss, Jr for Defendants 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (Kloss, William) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/15 11:07 AM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 3:24-cv-103 and 1:24-cv-189 are NOT related. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins, Judge Michael J. Newman and Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 4/15/2024. (er) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 04/12 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2024 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Penny L. Barrick for Plaintiff Brenda K. Butler (Barrick, Penny) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Clerks Notice to Pro Hac Vice Attorney
Mon 04/08 9:46 AM
Notice of Pro Hac Vice Rules by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio as to Attorneys Gabriel Assaad, Adria Conklin, Benjamin W Hulse, and Danielle T Morrison (kk2) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District
Fri 04/05 11:31 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:23-cv-02307. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 04/05 11:38 AM
Judge Sarah D. Morrison and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. (er) |
||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER: Butler v. 3M Co., Case No. 23-cv-2307, is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 4/1/2024.(CBC) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/5/2024.] | |
Att: 1 | ||
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/5/2024.] | |
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle T Morrison on behalf of 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Morrison, Danielle) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/5/2024.] | |
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adria Conklin on behalf of 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Conklin, Adria) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/5/2024.] | |
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W. Hulse on behalf of All Defendants. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/5/2024.] | |
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 (Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file IN RE: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Bair MDL website at:[LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/mdl-cases] . (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/5/2024.] | |
4 | 4 MDL PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1. Establishing Procedures. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016.(MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/5/2024.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/5/2024.] | |
2 | 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 23-cv-2307 (JNE/DTS). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/5/2024.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Brenda Butler against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10450040) filed by Brenda Butler. Filer requests summons issued. (Assaad, Gabriel) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/5/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |