Connecticut District Court
Judge:Stefan R Underhill
Referred: Robert M Spector
Case #: 3:24-cv-00633
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
10 10 respm Response Tue 05/14 2:13 PM
RESPONSE - EXHIBIT A re6 Standing Protective Order filed by Peter J. Rizzo. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/09 9:42 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 4/9/2024. (Corriette, M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
8 8 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Fri 04/05 3:31 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Prisoner E-Filing Order (Intake) Fri 04/05 3:31 PM
Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Chief Judge on 6/22/2016. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Fri 04/05 3:30 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/5/2024. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Electronic Filing Order Fri 04/05 3:30 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/5/2024. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Fri 04/05 2:48 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Peter J. Rizzo. (Shafer, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/05 2:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter J. Rizzo. (Shafer, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/05 2:47 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Peter J. Rizzo against Semple. (Shafer, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Fri 04/05 2:49 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4 5-2024 (Shafer, J.)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/05 2:50 PM
District Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Shafer, J.)
Related: [-]