Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Melissa Damian
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:24-cv-60543
Nature of Suit430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking
Cause11:0523 Discharge of Tax Liability
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2024
Terminated:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 9:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Bank of America
Represented By
Jason Richard Bowyer
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Jackson McKnight Story
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Mediator
Gregory P. Holder
Plaintiff
Joseph Marks
3420 N.E. 17th Way
Oakland Park, FL 33334


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, February 20, 2025
66 66 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 02/20 3:06 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, Motions terminated:27 MOTION to Supplement the Record with Newly Discovered Evidence filed by Joseph Marks,24 MOTION amended Motion to Certfy Questions to The United States Supreme Court re18 MOTION to Certify Questions to the United States Supreme Court filed by Joseph Marks,13 MOTION to Quash Service of Process MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint filed by Bank of America,56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Marks,50 MOTION Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice of Defendant's Failure to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. re44 MOT. (With Prejudice) Motions terminated:24 MOTION amended Motion to Certfy Questions to The United States Supreme Court re18 MOTION to Certify Questions to the United States Supreme Court filed by Joseph Marks,27 MOTION to Supplement the Record with Newly Discovered Evidence filed by Joseph Marks,13 MOTION to Quash Service of Process MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint filed by Bank of America,56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Marks,50 MOTION Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice of Defendant's Failure to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. re44 MOT. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 2/20/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
65 65 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Thu 02/20 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Joint by Bank of America (Bowyer, Jason)
Related: [-]