Herrera v. 1100 West Investments, LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roy K Altman |
Referred: | Eduardo I Sanchez |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21280 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 3:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
1100 West Investments, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Oscar Herrera
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit
Tue 04/16 12:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT signed by: OSCAR HERRERA re4 Order of Requirements,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, by Oscar Herrera (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Mon 04/08 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re4 Order of Requirements,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, (Verified Certificate of Prior ADA Filings) by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Oscar Herrera (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order of Requirements ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/08 2:42 PM
ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT AND VERIFIED AFFIDAVIT REGARDING VISITS TO PROPERTY. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs counsel shall file a verified response to this Order by April 19, 2024. In addition, the named plaintiff shall file a verified affidavit regarding his past visits to the property, as well as a description of his concrete plans to return to it, by that date. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/8/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/05 3:35 PM
Summons Issued as to 1100 West Investments, LLC. (pc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/05 3:28 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) |
|
1 | 1
21
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 2:51 PM
COMPLAINT against 1100 West Investments, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17426558, filed by Oscar Herrera.(Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |