Charles, Paul v. Florida Department of Corrections
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Altonaga |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80414 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Mon 04/29 3:35 PM
ORDER denying4 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Reopen Case
Fri 04/26 3:32 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Paul Charles. (caw) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Fri 04/05 5:50 PM
ORDER that Petitioner, Paul Charles's Petition under 28 U.S.C. [Section] 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. All pending motions are DENIED as moot, and the Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (wc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Fri 04/05 2:39 PM
Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (kma) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 04/05 2:32 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 (Filing fee not paid/IFP Motion not filed), filed by Paul Charles.(kma) |