Kramer v. Probation
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Bataillon |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00123 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2024 |
Interested Party
Nebraska Attorney General
|
|
Petitioner
Tim Kramer
|
|
Respondent
Probation
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment - Pro Se
Thu 04/25 2:58 PM
JUDGMENT - PRO SE regarding Memorandum and Order5 . Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order entered this date, the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is dismissed without prejudice. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JES) |
|
Att: 1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases | ||
5 | 5
6
pgs
order
Memorandum and Order
Thu 04/25 2:36 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The petition for writ of habeas corpus, Filing No.1 , is dismissed without prejudice. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. A judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JES) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/24 4:18 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Filing No.2 , is granted. The next step in this case is for the Court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The Court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JES) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
oth_evt
Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)
Fri 04/05 1:56 PM
NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (JES) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/05 1:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Tim Kramer. (JES) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 04/05 1:46 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by pro se petitioner Tim Kramer. (JES) |