Karim v. Chalk Couture Holdings, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lorna G Schofield |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02601 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 3:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Chalk Couture Holdings, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Karim
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 12:52 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Chalk Couture Holdings, LLC served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024. Service was accepted by Michelle Pearlman, General Manager. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 04/09 2:55 PM
ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference will be held on May 29, 2024 at 4:20 p.m. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. Initial Conference set for 5/29/2024 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/9/2024) (rro) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 11:35 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chalk Couture Holdings, LLC..(pc) |
|
4 | 4
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Mon 04/08 10:41 AM
DECLARATION of Robert D. Moody in Support re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/08 10:13 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/08 10:14 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/08 10:14 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 2:16 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chalk Couture Holdings, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/05 2:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Gabriel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 2:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Chalk Couture Holdings, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29181124)Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel) |