Karim v. Dance America, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Valerie E Caproni |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02605 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Dance America, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Karim
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/16 3:12 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Dance America, Inc. served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Cassandra Schneider, Owner. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 04/08 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT: The Defendant(s)' time to move against or answer the Complaint is stayed until the date of the IPTC, unless otherwise ordered. Initial Conference set for 8/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 FoleySquare, New York, New York, 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/8/2024) (vfr) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 11:35 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dance America, Inc...(pc) |
|
4 | 4
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Mon 04/08 10:46 AM
DECLARATION of Robert D. Moody in Support re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/08 10:30 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/08 10:31 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/08 10:31 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 2:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dance America, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/05 2:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Gabriel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 2:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Dance America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29181467)Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel) |