Constanza et al v. Sparta Insurance Company et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nannette Jolivette Brown |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00871 |
Nature of Suit | 368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Asbestos Litigation |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, 24-01931 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 3:07 PM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer CropScience, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Foster-Wheeler LLC
|
|
Defendant
General Electric Company
|
|
Defendant
Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
International Paper Company
|
|
Defendant
Paramount Global
|
|
Defendant
Sparta Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Uniroyal, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Erica Dandry Constanza
|
|
Plaintiff
Monica Dandry Hallner
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 04/30 2:41 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re7 MOTION For Entry of Pathology Order . Document was filed in incorrect case and has been marked as such on the record. (mp) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/30 2:20 PM
*FILED IN INCORRECT CASE*: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JOINT PATHOLOGY ORDER by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Paul, Kimmier) Modified on 4/30/2024 (mp) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Tue 04/30 12:59 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Paul, Kimmier) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Third Party Complaint Crossclaim
Tue 04/30 12:57 PM
Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The Manville Personal Injury Trust, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company as insurer of Wayne Manufacturing Co., CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Bayer CropScience, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Foster-Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., International Paper Company, Paramount Global, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Uniroyal, Inc. by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Paul, Kimmier) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Compliance
Fri 04/19 11:44 AM
Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Paul, Kimmier) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/08 9:47 AM
DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal.(mp) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 04/05 3:59 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (meb) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/05 3:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2024-01931 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10472312) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.Attorney Kimmier L. Paul added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Paul, Kimmier) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Pleadings |