Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:George Caram Steeh
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:24-cv-10881
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2024
Terminated:Jun 13, 2024
Case in other court:6TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, COUNTY OF OAKLAND, 24-205568-CZ
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 9:55 AM EDT
Defendant
LG Electronics Alabama, Inc
Represented By
Edward W. Hearn
Johnson & Bell, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By
Alyssa J. Endelman
Denenberg Tuffley, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Thursday, June 13, 2024
12 12 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Thu 06/13 1:16 PM
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (LSau)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order Thu 06/13 10:42 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING 11 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (LSau)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/11 4:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulated Order of Dismissal (with Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal) by All Plaintiffs (Shults, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal
Thursday, June 06, 2024
order Text-Only Order Thu 06/06 3:51 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING re 10 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (LSau)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/05 3:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulated Order of Dismissal by Allstate Indemnity Company (Shults, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
order Text-Only Order Mon 05/06 3:44 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Parties are to submit a Joint Discovery Plan by June 6, 2024. The Court will determine at that time if a Scheduling Conference will need to be set or will enter a Scheduling Order based off the Joint Discovery Plan. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (LSau)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/03 5:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
8 8 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 04/30 5:07 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Indemnity Company for Allstate Indemnity Company. (Endelman, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 04/30 5:03 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alyssa J. Endelman appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Allstate Indemnity Company, as Subrogee of Jeff Mazoway (Endelman, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 04/25 2:36 PM
ORDER Granting4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., ( Response due by 5/13/2024 ), Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
5 5 notice Notice - Other Tue 04/23 9:27 AM
NOTICE by LG Electronics Alabama, Inc of No Objection for Extension of Time (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/22 4:13 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 04/08 9:00 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MSyl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
3 3 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 04/05 4:03 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA, INC. (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Fri 04/05 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W. Hearn on behalf of LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA, INC.. (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Fri 04/05 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA, INC. from 6th Judicial Circuit for the County of Oakland, case number 2024-205568-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9740476 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H