KELSO v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | J Nicholas Ranjan |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00518 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 4:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
ALLEGHENY COUNTY
|
|
Defendant
JASON COSTANZO
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM GOOD
|
|
Defendant
JOHN HARING
|
|
Defendant
DANIEL MAYER
|
|
Plaintiff
DARNELL L. KELSO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Tue 04/09 4:28 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT,. ERROR: Missing county of residence on cover sheet. CORRECTION: Refile cover sheet using errata event. (jkn) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 04/08 3:58 PM
Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan added. (cel) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Fri 04/05 4:17 PM
COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY, JASON COSTANZO, WILLIAM GOOD, JOHN HARING, DANIEL MAYER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8202721), filed by DARNELL L. KELSO. (Sansone, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |