ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A.
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Caryl E Delano |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-00464 |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A., Debtor
13670 Metropolis Ave Ste 104
Fort Myers, FL 33912-4346 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - FTM
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E. Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
court
ADI - Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day
Tue 04/30 12:16 AM
A properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order26 is not indicated on the docket. Alan Hamisch is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
court
ADI - Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day
Mon 04/29 12:16 AM
A properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order25 is not indicated on the docket. Alan Hamisch is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk) |
||
Saturday, April 27, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Sun 04/28 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 04/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
court
Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)
Thu 04/25 3:19 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Declaration concerning schedules Not Filed, 341 Notice Not Served, Creditors Not Uploaded, and Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed . (Williams, Ro'Shaila) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Wed 04/24 11:43 AM
Order Discharging Order To Show Cause Why A Patient Care Ombudsman Should Not Be Appointed . Service Instructions: Alan Hamisch is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Juan) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
order
Generic Order
Tue 04/23 4:59 PM
Order Granting Motion to Waive Ombudsman Pursuant to 11 USC 333 . Service Instructions: Alan Hamisch is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lidia) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)
Mon 04/22 9:13 AM
Schedules A - J and Summary of Assets, Includes addition or deletion of creditors to Schedules. Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Alan F Hamisch on behalf of Debtor ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A.. (Hamisch, Alan) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
Wed 04/17 5:24 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Alan Hamisch, Ben Lambers, Michael Markham WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Order to Show Cause why a Patient Care Ombudsman should not be appointed; Doc. # 9 Motion to Waive Ombudsman Pursuant to 11 USC 333 Filed by Alan F Hamisch on behalf of Debtor ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A.; Doc.# 20 (not noticed for hearing) - Granted, discharge order to show cause O/Hamisch Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Affidavit (BK)
Wed 04/17 10:21 AM
Affidavit OF ALAN F. HAMISCH IN SUPPORT OF DEBTORS APPLICATION TO EMPLOY THE LAW OFFICE OF ALAN F. HAMISCH AS COUNSEL FOR DEBTOR AND DEBTOR IN POSSESSION AS OF THE PETITION DATE Filed by Alan F Hamisch on behalf of Debtor ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A. . (Hamisch, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Application to Employ/Retain
Tue 04/16 7:54 PM
|
|
20 | 20
motion
Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event) (BK)
Tue 04/16 7:43 PM
Motion to Waive Ombudsman Pursuant to 11 USC 333 Filed by Alan F Hamisch on behalf of Debtor ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A. |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Affidavit (BK)
Mon 04/15 1:14 PM
Affidavit of No Malpractice Claims Filed by Alan F Hamisch on behalf of Debtor ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A.. (Hamisch, Alan) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
Mon 04/15 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order . Notice Date 04/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Tax Documents
Sat 04/13 8:37 AM
Tax Documents for the Year 2022 Filed by Alan F Hamisch on behalf of Debtor ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A.. (Hamisch, Alan) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney
Sat 04/13 8:18 AM
Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Alan F Hamisch on behalf of Debtor ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A.. (Hamisch, Alan) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
Sat 04/13 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order . Notice Date 04/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order Prescribing Procedures - Ch. 11 SubV Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, Set Status Conf
Fri 04/12 11:17 AM
Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-102, Hearing Room, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Vivianne) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 04/12 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 04/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Thu 04/11 12:09 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:24-bk-00464] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A75079829, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Thu 04/11 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 04/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary
Wed 04/10 11:43 AM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Alan F Hamisch on behalf of Debtor ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A.. (Hamisch, Alan) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition
Wed 04/10 11:39 AM
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Alan F Hamisch on behalf of Debtor ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A.. (Hamisch, Alan) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order To Show Cause
Wed 04/10 8:36 AM
Order to Show Cause why a Patient Care Ombudsman should not be appointed . Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2024 at 10:30 AM at Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-102, Hearing Room, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Penny) |
|
court
COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
Wed 04/10 10:13 AM
Change of Law Firm submitted to the Court on April 9, 2024, by Attorney Alan F. Hamisch who was formerly associated with Hamisch & Hurvitz, PLLC and is now associated with The Law Office of Alan F Hamisch. (Sara M.) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Tue 04/09 12:22 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/2/2024 at 03:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. Proofs of Claims due by 6/14/2024. (Ryan S.) |
|
7 | 7
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Tue 04/09 9:54 AM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/2/2024 at 01:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. Proofs of Claims due by 6/14/2024. (Ryan S.) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
court
Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)
Mon 04/08 4:03 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G and H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Attorney Disclosure of Compensation, Certificate or resolution authorizing debtor to file Bankruptcy Petition, Case Management Summary, Small Business Balance Sheet and Filing Fee . (Penny) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
trustee
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee
Mon 04/08 3:39 PM
Amended Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee . Michael C Markham added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - FTM. (Lambers, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Verified Statement | ||
4 | 4
trustee
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee
Mon 04/08 9:22 AM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee . Michael C Markham added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - FTM. (Lambers, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Verified Statement | ||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Fri 04/05 5:28 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Alan F Hamisch on behalf of Debtor ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A.. (Hamisch, Alan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration
Fri 04/05 4:12 PM
Declaration re: No no balance sheet, statement of operations or cash-flow statement Filed by Alan F Hamisch on behalf of Debtor ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A.. (Hamisch, Alan) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 04/05 4:05 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. Health Care Business. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Alan F Hamisch on behalf of ROBERT B. PRITT D.O., P.A.. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/5/2024. (Hamisch, Alan) |
|
court
ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Fri 04/05 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |