Scarane v. MD Now Medical Centers, Inc. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21282 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
MD Now Medical Centers, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
MEDICREDIT INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
Marguerite Stella Scarane
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 04/29 4:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Medicredit, Inc. shall respond to the Complaint on or before May 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 04/29 4:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by MEDICREDIT INC.. Attorney Drew Patrick O'Malley added to party MEDICREDIT INC.(pty:dft). (O'Malley, Drew) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 04/19 4:29 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Marguerite Stella Scarane. MEDICREDIT INC. served on 4/10/2024, response/answer due 5/1/2024. (Patti, Thomas) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 04/19 4:27 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Marguerite Stella Scarane. MD Now Medical Centers, Inc. served on 4/10/2024, response/answer due 5/1/2024. (Patti, Thomas) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 12:41 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Marguerite Stella Scarane (Patti, Thomas) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Mon 04/08 10:26 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 9:40 AM
Summons Issued as to MD Now Medical Centers, Inc., MEDICREDIT INC.. (amb) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/08 9:32 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17427066, filed by Marguerite Stella Scarane.(Patti, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh B, | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) Summons Medicredit, | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s) Summons MD Now |