Haley v. Garda World Security Corp. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80418 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 5:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Garda World Security Corp.
|
|
Defendant
GardaWorld Cash Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
United American Security, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Tyler Haley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Report
Wed 05/01 10:19 PM
STATUS REPORT re. Process of Service by Joseph Tyler Haley(Yanchunis, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 04/30 1:00 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. At least six cases have been assigned to the undersigned that appear to relate to the same underlying facts: 24-CV-80400, 24-CV-80403, 24-CV-80404, 24-CV-80411, 24-CV-80418, and 24-CV-80438. The parties in each case shall confer and file a single, consolidated notice in case 24-CV-80400 (the earliest filed case). In the Notice, the parties shall inform the Court of the their respective positions on (1) whether they are in agreement that the cases are all premised on the same underlying facts, (2) whether they are in agreement that the cases should be consolidated, (3) whether they are in agreement that one consolidated complaint should be filed, (4) whether they are in agreement that, upon the filing of a consolidated complaint, all later-filed cases may be closed, and (5) whether there is any additional information the Court should be aware of on the status of this case. The parties' consolidated Notice is due by May 15, 2024. The page limit for the Notice is 10 pages. The deadline for the Defendant to file a responsive pleading or motion (provided the Defendant has been served) is extended to May 22, 2024, in each case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 04/30 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip E. Rothschild on behalf of United American Security, LLC. Attorney Philip E. Rothschild added to party United American Security, LLC (pty:dft). (Rothschild, Philip) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions
Thu 04/25 4:45 PM
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Garda World Security Corp., GardaWorld Cash Services Inc. (Rothschild, Philip) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/25 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip E. Rothschild on behalf of Garda World Security Corp., GardaWorld Cash Services Inc.. Attorney Philip E. Rothschild added to party Garda World Security Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Philip E. Rothschild added to party GardaWorld Cash Services Inc. (pty:dft). (Rothschild, Philip) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 3:46 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joseph Tyler Haley. United American Security, LLC served on 4/9/2024, response/answer due 4/30/2024. (Yanchunis, John) |
|
10 | 10
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 04/24 10:18 AM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 9:45 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney John G. Emerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/24/2024. (hk02) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order of Requirements
Mon 04/22 11:40 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Wed 04/17 3:53 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John G. Emerson. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17456383 by Joseph Tyler Haley. Responses due by 5/1/2024.(Yanchunis, John) |
|
Att: 1 Certification, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning/Transferring Case
Wed 04/17 9:36 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 4/17/2024. Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 04/12 1:03 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joseph Tyler Haley. GardaWorld Cash Services Inc. served on 4/11/2024, response/answer due 5/2/2024. (Yanchunis, John) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Bar Letter
Mon 04/08 10:26 AM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Ronald Podolny and John G. Emerson, mailing date April 8, 2024, (pt) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 8:44 AM
Summons Issued as to GardaWorld Cash Services Inc., United American Security, LLC. (cds) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/08 8:40 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 4:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Garda World Security Corp., GardaWorld Cash Services Inc., United American Security, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17427326, filed by Joseph Tyler Haley.(Yanchunis, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) |