Banks v. Geodis Logistics, LLC et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edmund A Sargus |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01595 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 5:17 PM EDT |
Defendant
Geodis Logistics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ryan Hart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amanda Hyde
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony Sweeney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Banks
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/30 4:34 PM
ORDER: The pretrial conference (Doc. 6) is VACATED. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is due 5/17/2024. Plaintiff's request to stay briefing on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 9) is DENIED. Discovery is STAYED pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/30/2024. (er) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 04/25 5:15 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Geodis Logistics, LLC, Ryan Hart, Amanda Hyde, Anthony Sweeney. (Page McGinnis, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 04/23 2:40 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Ryan Hart, Anthony Sweeney. (Page McGinnis, Christopher) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/15 4:30 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Ferrell. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/15/2024. (er) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/12 7:33 PM
ANSWER to5 Complaint of Plaintiff Michael Banks filed by All Defendants. (Page McGinnis, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 04/10 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2024 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/07 12:25 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed originally in Franklin County CCP on 2/29/2024 by Michael Banks against Geodis Logistics, LLC, Ryan Hart, Amanda Hyde & Anthony Sweeney. (er) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/05 7:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number BOHSDC-9908118) of Michael S. Ferrell by Defendants Geodis Logistics, LLC, Ryan Hart, Amanda Hyde, Anthony Sweeney. (Page McGinnis, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Michael S. Ferrell | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/05 7:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Geodis Logistics, LLC. (Page McGinnis, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/05 7:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T. Page McGinnis for Defendants Geodis Logistics, LLC, Ryan Hart, Amanda Hyde, Anthony Sweeney (Page McGinnis, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/05 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Franklin County, Ohio, case number 24-CV-001764 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9907647), filed by Ryan Hart, Anthony Sweeney, Geodis Logistics, LLC, Amanda Hyde. (Page McGinnis, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Declaration of Ben Bodzy, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Declaration of Amanda Hyde, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Declaration of Anthony Sweeney, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan Hart, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit State Court File, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 13 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 14 Appendix Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet |