Texas Northern District Court
Judge:David C Godbey
Referred: David L Horan
Case #: 3:24-cv-00841
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 8:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Chasity Lewallen
Defendant
Robertson Anschutz Schneid Crane & Partners PLLC
Defendant
NewRez LLC
Defendant
Willow Bend Mortgage Company
Defendant
Baron Silverstein
Defendant
Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Defendant
Craig Schrank
Defendant
Shelley Ortolani
Defendant
Francesca Ortolani
Defendant
National City Mortgage Co
Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant
Mary Mancuso
Defendant
Leo E Knight
Defendant
Jane Kline
Defendant
Michel A Khalaf
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Defendant
Payton Hreha
Defendant
Michelel Hreha
Defendant
Jamie Dimon
Defendant
Carol Cunmon
Plaintiff
Neisy Casanova
10410 Wood Drive
Rowlett, TX 75089


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
26 26 service Certificate of Service Wed 02/26 11:56 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Neisy Casanova re25 Affidavit of Truth,24 MOTION for Discovery. (axm)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Affidavit Wed 02/26 11:55 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Truth by Neisy Casanova. (axm)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Discovery Wed 02/26 11:54 AM
MOTION for Discovery filed by Neisy Casanova. (axm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
misc Order Receipt Wed 02/12 8:29 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:23. Wed Feb 12 08:29:58 CST 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 02/12 8:29 AM
ORDER denying20 Motion to Continue trial. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/11/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
22 22 service Certificate of Service Thu 01/02 8:48 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Neisy Casanova re20 MOTION for Continuance21 Declaration. (kcr)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Affidavit Thu 01/02 8:46 AM
Declaration by Neisy Casanova. (kcr)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Continue Thu 01/02 8:46 AM
MOTION for Continuance filed by Neisy Casanova. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
19 19 order Judgment Mon 12/23 11:48 AM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 12/23/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Mon 12/23 11:45 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING16 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 12/23/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 12/23 11:48 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:18, 19. Mon Dec 23 11:48:51 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
17 17 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Wed 11/20 10:03 AM
***DISREGARD ENTERED IN ERROR*** Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (kcr) Modified on 11/20/2024 (kcr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
16 16 motion Findings and Recommendations Thu 11/14 12:37 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss this action without prejudice, as applicable, underFederal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/14/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 11/14 12:38 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16. Thu Nov 14 12:38:26 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
15 15 4 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Tue 09/17 8:30 AM
ORDER WITHDRAWING13 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION AND SETTING DEADLINES: As to each defendant that Casanova believes has been properly served, Casanova must move for entry of default and a default judgment by 10/17/2024, or the undersigned will recommend that the Court dismiss Casanova's claims against that defendant without prejudice. Alternatively, as to each defendant that Casanova believes has not been properly served, 10/17/2024 is Casanova's deadline to file a motion for extension of time under Rule 4(m). And the failure to do that will again result in a recommendation that the Court dismiss Casanova's claims against the unserved (or not properly served) defendant. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/16/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
14 14 respoth Objection to Findings and Recommendations Fri 09/13 11:13 AM
OBJECTION to13 Findings and Recommendations. (ndt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Page(s),
Att: 2 Additional Page(s)
Friday, September 06, 2024
misc Order Receipt Fri 09/06 9:07 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Fri Sep 6 09:07:33 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
13 13 motion Findings and Recommendations Fri 09/06 9:06 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Case re:3 Complaint. The Court should dismiss this action without prejudice, as applicable, under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) and 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/5/2024) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
12 12 misc Affidavit Thu 05/23 4:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Truth by Neisy Casanova. (axm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
misc Order Receipt Mon 05/06 10:00 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Mon May 6 10:00:43 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Fri 05/03 3:38 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING5 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court therefore DENIES Plaintiff Neisy Casanova's Emergency Motion to Stop Foreclosure Sale Temporary Restraining Orders [Dkt. No.4 ]. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 5/3/2024) (axm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
10 10 respoth Objection to Findings and Recommendations Fri 04/12 2:31 PM
Fraud on the Court Notice of appeal re:5 Findings and Recommendations by Neisy Casanova. (kcr) (Main Document 10 replaced with corrected image on 4/12/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
9 9 respoth Objection to Findings and Recommendations Fri 04/12 2:31 PM
Fraud on the Court Notice of Appeal re:5 Findings and Recommendations by Neisy Casanova. (kcr)
Related: [-]
8 8 respoth Objection to Findings and Recommendations Fri 04/12 2:30 PM
Validate UCC Financing Statement Notice of Appeal re:5 Findings and Recommendations by Neisy Casanova. (kcr)
Related: [-]
7 7 respoth Objection to Findings and Recommendations Fri 04/12 2:29 PM
Fraud on the Court Notice of Appeal re:5 Findings and Recommendations by Neisy Casanova. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
misc Order Receipt Tue 04/09 9:54 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Apr 9 09:54:09 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/09 9:53 AM
ORDER REGARDING SERVICE: The Court further advises Casanova that, if proper service is not made and shown to the Court through a filed proof of service (or a waiver of service obtained and filed with the Court) before the 90th day after the filing of this action (on 4/5/2024) that is not a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday which will be 7/5/2024 this case is subject to dismissal without prejudice unless Casanova shows both (1) good cause for this failure and (2) good cause for the Court to extend the time for service for an appropriate, specified period. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/8/2024) (cfk)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 04/08 11:16 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Apr 8 11:16:28 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
5 5 motion Findings and Recommendations Mon 04/08 11:15 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Motion re:4 Emergency Motion to Stop Foreclosure Sale. The Court should deny Emergency Motion to Stop Foreclosure Sale TemporaryRestraining Orders (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/5/2024) (ykp)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/05 3:32 PM
Emergency Motion to Stop Foreclosure Sale filed by Neisy Casanova. (kcr)
Related: [-]
3 3 166 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/05 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Carol Cunmon, Jamie Dimon, Michelel Hreha, Payton Hreha, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Michel A Khalaf, Jane Kline, Leo E Knight, Chasity Lewallen, Mary Mancuso, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, National City Mortgage Co, Newrez LLC, Francesca Ortolani, Shelley Ortolani, Robertson, Anschutz, Schneid, Crane, & Partners PLLC, Craig Schrank, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Baron Silverstein, Willow Bend Mortgage Company filed by Neisy Casanova. (Filing fee $405.00; Receipt number 300011197) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (kcr)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Fri 04/05 3:21 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (kcr)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Godbey Fri 04/05 3:20 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 04/05 3:32 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Fri Apr 5 15:32:58 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]