Martinez v. Warden FCI Ashland
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | David L Bunning |
Referred: | P So |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-00042 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 04/15 3:15 PM
Filing fee Filing fee received - $ 5.00, receipt number 706 (JLS) |
|
utility
File Submitted
Mon 04/15 3:15 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: filing fee (JLS) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Other Notice
Wed 04/10 11:33 AM
AFFIDAVIT by Jonathan Martinez.(JLS) |
|
Att: 1 env, pm 4-8-24 | ||
utility
File Submitted
Wed 04/10 11:34 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:4 Affidavit. (JLS) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Pro Se Information Packet
Fri 04/05 4:40 PM
IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court.[LINK:Click here for more information on the rules.] It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail(KSS) |
|
Att: 1 Sample Caption | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 04/05 4:36 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jonathan Martinez, pro se.(KSS) (KSS) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope (no postmark) | ||
Att: 2 (4/5/2024) Form BP 199.045 | ||
misc
Conflict Check
Fri 04/05 4:37 PM
Conflict Check run. (KSS) |
||
utility
File Submitted
Fri 04/05 4:45 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (KSS) |