Moore v. Checkpoint Therapeutics, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02613 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 6:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Checkpoint Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Garrett Gray
|
|
Defendant
James F. Oliviero
|
|
Plaintiff
James Moore
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 5:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy J Fitzmaurice on behalf of Checkpoint Therapeutics, Inc., Garrett Gray, James F. Oliviero..(Fitzmaurice, Timothy) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 5:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett D. Jaffe on behalf of Checkpoint Therapeutics, Inc., Garrett Gray, James F. Oliviero..(Jaffe, Brett) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Wed 04/24 5:50 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated April 24, 2024 re: Letter in Response to Courts Order Dated April 9, 2024 (Dkt. No. 5). Document filed by James Moore..(Lieberman, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Copy of Press Release | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 1:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Michael LoPiano on behalf of James Moore..(LoPiano, James) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 1:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of James Moore..(Hood, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/09 10:29 AM
ORDER On April 5, 2024, plaintiff filed this putative class action "on behalf of persons and entities that purchased or otherwise acquired Checkpoint securities between March 10, 2021 and December 15, 2023, both dates inclusive." Dkt. 1 ("Compl.") paragraph 1. The Complaint alleges violations of Sections 10(b) and 20(a) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 ("Exchange Act"), 15 U.S.C. § 78 et seq., and Rule lOb-5 promulgated thereunder. Id. paragraph 60-75. Under Section 78u-4(a)(3)(A) of the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act("PSLRA"), 15 U.S.C. § 78u-4(a)(3)(A), "[n]ot later than 20 days after the date on which the complaint is filed, the plaintiff or plaintiffs shall cause to be published, in a widely circulated national business-oriented publication or wire service, a notice advising members of the purported plaintiff class...of the pendency of the action, the claims asserted therein, and the purported class period." 15 U.S.C. § 78u-4(a)(3)(A)(i). The Court orders plaintiff to advise the Court, no later than April 29, 2024, of the date and manner in which he published this notice. The Court will then set a briefing schedule for members of the putative class to seek appointment as lead plaintiff. See 15 U.S.C. § 78u-4(a)(3)(B)(i) ("[N]ot later than 60 days after the date on which the notice is published, any member of the purported class may move the court to serve as lead plaintiff of the purported class."). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/9/2024) (jca) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 10:21 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Checkpoint Therapeutics, Inc., Garrett Gray, James F. Oliviero..(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/08 10:18 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/08 10:19 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/08 10:20 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/05 5:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Checkpoint Therapeutics, Inc., Garrett Gray, James F. Oliviero, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by James Moore..(Lieberman, Jeremy) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/05 5:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lieberman, Jeremy) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 5:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Checkpoint Therapeutics, Inc., Garrett Gray, James F. Oliviero. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29183516)Document filed by James Moore..(Lieberman, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certification, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Schedule A |