Gardner L v. O'Malley
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia A Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00134 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/08 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luis A. Pere on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Pere, Luis) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Parties of Assignment of U.S. Magistrate Judge - Random
Mon 04/08 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Within 14 days of receipt of this notice, parties must either consent or decline to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by completing a Consent/Declination form. Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 4/22/2024. Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 4/22/2024. (Hill, Cherelle) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Case Opening Notice Social Security (Form Attached)
Mon 04/08 10:49 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.[LINK:Personal Identifier Statement] due 4/9/2024. (Hill, Cherelle) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/08 10:30 AM
TEXT ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/8/2024. (Saucier, Martha) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/05 2:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gardner Lillian. (Maguire, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - New Case
Fri 04/05 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Gardner Lillian.(Maguire, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/05 4:02 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle) |