Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:William M Conley
Referred: Anita Marie Boor
Case #: 3:24-cv-00216
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2024
Terminated:Oct 08, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Monday, December 02, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 12/02 1:25 PM
ORDER granting19 Stipulation for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the EAJA. Plaintiff awarded fees and expenses in the amount of $7,300. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/2/24. (jat)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Stipulation Mon 12/02 12:22 PM
Stipulation for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the EAJA by Defendant Martin J. O'Malley. (Levitt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Tue 10/08 10:05 AM
ORDER granting17 Joint Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/8/24. (jat)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
17 17 motion Remand Mon 10/07 6:06 PM
Joint MOTION TO REMAND by Defendant Martin J. O'Malley. (Levitt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/07 6:04 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by David Levitt for Defendant Martin J. O'Malley. (Levitt, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 09/11 10:39 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time, Dkt.14 , is GRANTED. Defendant's brief in opposition due October 16, 2024; plaintiff's reply brief due October 30, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 9/11/24. (jat)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time Wed 09/11 9:11 AM
Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant Martin J. O'Malley. (Han, Lu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
13 13 respm Brief in Support Thu 08/15 4:23 PM
Brief in Support of12 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Shelley M. Challoner (Duncan, Dana)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Thu 08/15 4:22 PM
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Shelley M. Challoner. (Duncan, Dana)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 08/02 3:27 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Shelley M. Challoner. Brief in Support due 8/16/2024. Brief in Opposition due 9/16/2024. Brief in Reply due 9/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew Wiseman on 8/2/2024. (arw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 08/01 9:07 AM
Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. (lak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time Wed 07/31 4:53 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Shelley M. Challoner. Response due 8/7/2024. (Duncan, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
9 9 order Text Only Order Tue 06/25 8:24 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time, Dkt.7 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff's brief in support is due August 5, 2024; defendant's brief in opposition is due September 4, 2024; and plaintiff's brief in reply is due September 18, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor on 6/25/2024. (jls)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/25 8:18 AM
Reminder: If you have not provided your Consent/Request for Reassignment form, please do so. (lak)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time Mon 06/24 12:52 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Shelley M. Challoner. Response due 7/1/2024. (Duncan, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
6 6 motion Social Security Hearing Transcript Tue 06/04 3:14 PM
Social Security Hearing Transcript by Defendant Martin J. O'Malley. Brief in Support due 7/5/2024. Brief in Opposition due 8/5/2024. Brief in Reply due 8/19/2024. (Han, Lu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit CAR part 2,
Att: 2 Exhibit CAR part 3,
Att: 3 Exhibit CAR part 4,
Att: 4 Exhibit CAR part 5,
Att: 5 Exhibit CAR part 6,
Att: 6 Exhibit CAR part 7,
Att: 7 Exhibit CAR part 8,
Att: 8 Exhibit CAR part 9
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/04 1:49 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Lu Han for Defendant Martin J. O'Malley. (Han, Lu)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Social Security Hearing Transcript Tue 06/04 1:42 PM
Disregard; per filer's request, submission refiled at dkt.6 . (jef)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 05/13 3:54 PM
Judge update in case. Case now assigned to Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Case no longer assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
3 3 order SLC Order Granting IFP Fri 04/05 3:21 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 4/5/2024. (lak)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/05 2:28 PM
Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shelley M. Challoner. (Duncan, Dana)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/05 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley., filed by Shelley M. Challoner. Transcript due 6/4/2024. (Duncan, Dana) Modified on 4/5/2024: 2023. (lak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add Judge for Shell Case Opening Fri 04/05 3:20 PM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker and Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman. (lak)
Related: [-]
utility Standard Attachments Sent Fri 04/05 3:20 PM
Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker:[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] ,[LINK:Order Regarding Assignment of Cases] ,[LINK:Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment] ,[LINK:Order on Dispositive Motions] . (lak)
Related: [-]