Metro Courier Inc
Kansas Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 6:24-bk-10263 |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Metro Courier Inc
PO Box 175
Wichita, KS 67201-0175 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Kent L Adams
2861 N Tee Time Ct
Wichita, KS 67205 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 301 North Main Suite 1150
Wichita, KS 67202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
48 | 48
misc
Amended Schedules
Wed 05/01 2:52 PM
Amended Schedules. Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Exhibit A | ||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
47 | 47
notice
Objection Deadline
Mon 04/29 9:27 AM
Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 06/13/24 at 10:30 a.m.. Certificate of Service on 04/29/24. Filed by Mark J Lazzo on behalf of Metro Courier Inc Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix | ||
46 | 46
motion
Employ
Mon 04/29 9:26 AM
Application to Employ Koch Siedhoff Hand & Dunn, L.L.P. as Accountant Filed on behalf of Debtor Metro Courier Inc, with Certificate of Service.(Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Saturday, April 27, 2024 | ||
45 | 45
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 04/27 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
order
Cash Collateral
Thu 04/25 3:26 PM
Final Order on Motion of Debtor to Use Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection Motion to Use Cash Collateral. Filed on behalf of Debtor Metro Courier Inc, with Certificate of Service. Signed on 4/25/2024. (wms) |
|
43 | 43
answer
Objection
Thu 04/25 1:41 PM
Objection to Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (Nemecek, John) |
|
court
Hearing Set (Motion)
Thu 04/25 3:57 PM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 5/9/2024 at 10:30 AM Wichita Courtroom 150 for5 . (wms) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
court
Courtroom Minute Sheet
Wed 04/24 11:33 AM
Courtroom Minute Sheet (MLH), Ruling: No objections have been filed. Mr Lazzo informs the Court that he has been in contact with inhouse counsel, Christine Medlock, for Fora Financial, who debtor believes as a first and prior lien in the receivables. The Interim Order is granted on a final basis, a Final Order to be submitted. Order due by 5/8/2024. (wms) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Motion)
Wed 04/24 11:33 AM
Hearing Held (wms) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 9:47 AM
Adversary case 24-05008 Complaint by Mark J Lazzo on behalf of Metro Courier Inc against Mark Brady. Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet | ||
40 | 40
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/22 8:33 AM
Status Report Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Amended Schedules
Thu 04/18 4:46 PM
Amended Schedules. Fee Amount $34 Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Schedule E F | ||
38 | 38
notice
Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H
Thu 04/18 4:45 PM
Notice of Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H Filed by Mark J Lazzo on behalf of Metro Courier Inc . (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Schedule E F | ||
37 | 37
misc
Change of Address
Thu 04/18 4:19 PM
Change of Address Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Change of Address
Thu 04/18 4:18 PM
Change of Address Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
crditcrd
Thu 04/18 4:49 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules (Fee)([LINK 24-10263 ) [misc,amdsch] ( 34.00). Receipt number A19136683,amount $ 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/15 3:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix | ||
34 | 34
court
Courtroom Minute Sheet
Mon 04/15 1:09 PM
AMENDED Courtroom Minute Sheet (MLH), Ruling: TO CORRECT HEARING TIME (wms) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 04/14 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
court
Courtroom Minute Sheet
Fri 04/12 4:27 PM
Courtroom Minute Sheet (MLH), Ruling: See CMS for full details. Continued to 4/24/24 @ 9:00 am for Final Hearing (wms) |
|
31 | 31
4
pgs
order
Cash Collateral
Fri 04/12 4:12 PM
Order on Debtor's Motion for Interim Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection Motion to Use Cash Collateral. Filed on behalf of Debtor Metro Courier Inc, with Certificate of Service. . Signed on 4/12/2024. (wms) |
|
court
Hearing Set (Motion)
Fri 04/12 4:14 PM
FINAL Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 4/24/2024 at 09:00 AM Wichita Courtroom 150 for10 , (wms) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/11 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/11 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 04/11 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Notice Date 04/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/10 2:12 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Chapter 11 Status Conference
Wed 04/10 1:00 PM
Order Scheduling Chapter 11 SubChapter V Status Conference and Directing Notice Signed on 4/10/2024 Status hearing to be held on 5/16/2024 at 09:45 AM at Wichita Courtroom 150. Pre-Status Report Due By 5/2/2024. (wms) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Request for Notice
Wed 04/10 4:58 AM
Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (Sharma, Amitkumar) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Request for Notice
Wed 04/10 4:55 AM
Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (Sharma, Amitkumar) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Request for Notice
Wed 04/10 4:54 AM
Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (Sharma, Amitkumar) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Request for Notice
Wed 04/10 4:52 AM
Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (Sharma, Amitkumar) |
|
utility
Flags Set-Reset
Wed 04/10 12:38 PM
Small Business Flag Terminated (wms) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tue 04/09 4:06 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/6/2024 at 02:00 PM at Conf Call by US Trustee. Objection to Section 523 Due: 7/5/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 6/14/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/2/2024. (wms) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Affidavit
Tue 04/09 4:06 PM
Affidavit Re: Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 2022 tax return | ||
19 | 19
misc
DeBN Request Form
Tue 04/09 1:18 PM
DeBN Request Form: Initial Declination Request for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H
Tue 04/09 1:16 PM
Notice of Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H Filed by Mark J Lazzo on behalf of Metro Courier Inc . (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 amended matrix | ||
17 | 17
misc
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
Tue 04/09 1:15 PM
Amendment to List of Creditors. Fee Amount $34 Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 amended matrix | ||
16 | 16
misc
Support Document
Tue 04/09 12:58 PM
Document filed in support of : 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor, Corporate Ownership Statement, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury, Equity Security Holders, Schedule A/B, Schedule D - Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H - Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities with Certificate of Service on 4/9/24. Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc . (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B | ||
15 | 15
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Tue 04/09 12:57 PM
List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. , Corporate Ownership Statement, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors. , Equity Security Holders , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property ., Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G: Non-Individual-Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H Non-Individual-Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
14 | 14
court
Correct Voluntary Petition
Tue 04/09 9:59 AM
Order to Correct Voluntary Petition in Bankruptcy. Signed on 4/9/2024 Incomplete Filings due by 4/19/2024. (wms) |
|
13 | 13
order
Debtor-In-Possession To Pay Taxes
Tue 04/09 9:34 AM
Order to Debtor in Possession Respecting Report and Payment of Federal Taxes Signed on 4/9/2024 (wms) |
|
12 | 12
order
Expedite Hearing
Tue 04/09 7:56 AM
Order Granting Application for Expedited Hearing . Signed on 4/9/2024. (wms) |
|
court
Hearing Set (Motion)
Tue 04/09 7:58 AM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 4/11/2024 at 10:30 AM Wichita Courtroom 150 for10 . (wms) |
||
crditcrd
Tue 04/09 1:19 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)([LINK 24-10263 ) [misc,amdcm] ( 34.00). Receipt number A19120712,amount $ 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Expediting Hearing
Mon 04/08 4:54 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed on behalf of Debtor Metro Courier Inc, with Certificate of Service.(Balbierz, Justin) |
|
10 | 10
8
pgs
motion
Cash Collateral
Mon 04/08 4:53 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral. Filed on behalf of Debtor Metro Courier Inc, with Certificate of Service.(Balbierz, Justin) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
trustee
Appointing Trustee (UST Only)
Fri 04/05 3:42 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee SubV Trustee . Kent L Adams added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Nemecek, John) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))
Fri 04/05 1:50 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc . (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Support Document
Fri 04/05 1:34 PM
Document filed in support of : Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card) with Certificate of Service on 4/5/24. Filed by Debtor Metro Courier Inc . (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Objection Deadline
Fri 04/05 1:31 PM
Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 5/9/24 at 10:30am. Certificate of Service on 4/5/24. Filed by Mark J Lazzo on behalf of Metro Courier Inc Objections due by 4/26/2024. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
motion
Employ
Fri 04/05 1:28 PM
Application to Employ Mark J. Lazzo and Justin T. Balbierz as Attorneys Filed on behalf of Debtor Metro Courier Inc, with Certificate of Service.(Lazzo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit - Lazzo | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit - Balbierz | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/05 1:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice. Please take notice that John Nemecek on behalf of U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee hereby enters Appearance in the above captioned bankruptcy case pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9010(b) and requests Notice of all matters which may come before the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, 4001, and 9007 at 301 N. Main, Ste. 1150, Wichita, KS 67202, 316-269-6216, John.Nemecek@usdoj.gov . This is a Text Only entry. No document is attached. Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Nemecek, John) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/05 1:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice. Please take notice that Richard A Kear on behalf of U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee hereby enters Appearance in the above captioned bankruptcy case pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9010(b) and requests Notice of all matters which may come before the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, 4001, and 9007 at 301 N. Main, Ste. 1150, Wichita, KS 67202, 316-269-6213, Richard.Kear@usdoj.gov . This is a Text Only entry. No document is attached. Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Kear, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/05 12:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice. Please take notice that Jordan M Sickman on behalf of U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee hereby enters Appearance in the above captioned bankruptcy case pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9010(b) and requests Notice of all matters which may come before the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, 4001, and 9007 at 301 N. Main, Ste. 1150, Wichita, KS 67202, 316-269-6176, Jordan.Sickman@usdoj.gov . This is a Text Only entry. No document is attached. Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Sickman, Jordan) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card)
Fri 04/05 12:46 PM
Chapter 11 Small Business, SubChapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Metro Courier Inc Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/5/2024. Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due by 04/12/2024. (Lazzo, Mark) |
|
crditcrd
Fri 04/05 1:37 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card)([LINK 24-10263 ) [misc,volp11cc] (1738.00). Receipt number A19116399,amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |