Stephens et al v. Monsanto Company
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02058 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Tennessee Middle, 3:24-cv-00101 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 5:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Danny Stephens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Stephens
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 04/17 2:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Danny Stephens et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 04/17 2:49 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Danny Stephens et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/17 2:48 PM
Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Danny Stephens et al.] by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 04/05 4:45 PM
Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:24-cv-00101. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-453) of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL No. 2741, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and electronically transmit the record to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 04/04/2024. (lh) | |
***Civil Case Terminated per Text Order 10 . (kc) | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-453) for case MDL 2741 received from NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (Case is ready for closing/transfer) (hb) | |
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Danny Stephens, Lisa Stephens. All Defendants. (Smith, Dominick) | |
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 1/31/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) | |
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 Summons issued as to Monsanto Company. Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail. (kc) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4001142), filed by Danny Stephens, Lisa Stephens.(kc) | |
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
TN State Bar status verified as active for David Randolph Smith, Dominick Randolph Smith admitted to this court . (kc) |