DESERT HAWK GOLD CORP.
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Hilary L Barnes |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-50337 |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 13, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Aug 12, 2024 |
Dismissed: | Nov 27, 2024 |
Terminated: | Feb 04, 2025 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
DESERT HAWK GOLD CORP.
1290 Holcomb Ave
Reno, NV 89502-2445 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
CHAPTER 11 - RN
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509 |
Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago |
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
66 | 66
court
Close Bankruptcy Case (Chapter 11 and Split/Transfer/Dismissed only)
Tue 02/04 3:37 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (mms) |