California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 3:24-cv-02092
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 7:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By
Byron Michael Purcell
Ivie Mcneill Wyatt Purcell & Diggs
contact info
Scott S. Humphreys
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Ryan Chad Casey Duckett
Ivie Mcneill Wyatt Purcell & Diggs, Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
California Plaza Owner, LLC
Represented By
Marissa Rhoades Boyd
Brown, Gee And Wenger LLP
contact info
Katherine Anne Fosseen Wenger
Brown, Gee & Wenger LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
59 59 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 05/08 2:45 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. The Court has received and reviewed the email dated May 8, 2025, from counsel seeking an extension to submit settlement conference statements in this matter and accordingly, the due date for settlement conference statements is reset to close of business on May 14, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 05/08 9:34 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Filing Procedure: Re:58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Per Civil Local Rule 79-5(f)(5), Administrative Motions to Seal and Administrative Motions to Consider Whether Another Party's Materials Should be Sealed must be filed as separate documents. Please re-file in its entirety under the separate ECF events: Civil Events --> Motions and Related Filings --> Motions --> General --> 1) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed 2) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
58 58 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Wed 05/07 3:49 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.(Humphreys, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration K. Yvette Coburn,
Att: 2 Declaration of Scott S. Humphreys,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit H,
Att: 5 Exhibit I,
Att: 6 Exhibit K,
Att: 7 Exhibit Y,
Att: 8 Exhibit AA,
Att: 9 Exhibit BB,
Att: 10 Exhibit CC,
Att: 11 Exhibit DD
57 57 motion Summary Judgment Wed 05/07 2:20 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 6/11/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/21/2025. Replies due by 5/28/2025.(Humphreys, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of K. Yvette Coburn,
Att: 2 Declaration of W. David Stell,
Att: 3 Declaration of Scott S. Humphreys,
Att: 4 Appendix of Exhibits,
Att: 5 Proposed Order