8
|
|
8
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/26 9:56 AM
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security, Wendi Anne Latimer, Social Security Administration. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 4/25/2024).(tg)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
misc
Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/25 6:17 PM
PROPOSED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Commissioner of Social Security..(Brown Casey, Candace)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 5:11 PM
ORDER: In an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, to conserve resources, and to promote judicial efficiency, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the designated Magistrate Judge, as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 4/23/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/23 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (laq)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Notice of Reassignment of Referral to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/23 10:10 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo no longer referred to the case..(laq)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/22 10:08 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Candace Marie Brown Casey on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Brown Casey, Candace)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/22 9:47 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 4/20/2024) (va)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
order
Standing Order re Briefing of Social Security Cases
Fri 04/05 9:47 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE BRIEFING OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 22-MISC-329 Standing Order filed November 21, 2022). WHEREAS, cases filed on and after December 1, 2022 under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), seeking judicial review on the record of final decisions by the Commissioner of Social Security ("Commissioner") denying applications for social security benefits, are governed by the simplified procedures set forth in the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions ("Supplemental Rules" or "Supp. R.");... in order to ensure the efficient disposition of cases subject to the Supplemental Rules, it is hereby ORDERED that, prior to seeking an extension of any deadline set forth in Supp. R. 4, 6, 7, or 8, the party seeking such extension shall attempt to meet and confer with the opposing party in a good faith effort to agree upon a reasonable and comprehensive schedule for all future filings in the case. If the parties reach agreement, the proposed schedule shall be presented to the Court for approval and, if approved, will govern all remaining proceedings in the case.... (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/18/2022) (pc)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/05 9:43 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/05 9:43 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 9:43 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
service
Notice of Commencement of Social Security Action
Fri 04/05 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY ACTION. The Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York are hereby notified of the commencement of this action. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 6/4/2024..(pc)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29175056)Document filed by Wendi Anne Latimer..(Olinsky, Howard)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action
|