Betances v. The City Commissioner of NYC Corrections et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Laura Taylor Swain |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02596 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
14
pgs
order
Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening)
Mon 04/29 4:18 PM
ORDER TO AMEND: Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within 60 days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 24-CV-2596 (LTS). An Amended Civil Rights Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within the time allowed, or seek an extension of time to do so, the Court will dismiss Plaintiff's Section 1983 claims for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted and decline supplemental jurisdiction of Plaintiff's state law claims. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/29/2024) (rro) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Wed 04/10 9:44 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Adonis Betances 1500 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (nb) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case
Tue 04/09 4:43 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE:The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. § 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/8/2024) (vn) |
|
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Mon 04/08 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Authorization
Fri 04/05 3:42 PM
PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Adonis Betances..(rdz) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/05 3:35 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Adonis Betances..(rdz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Deputy Commissioner Warden, Officer of Corrections on Duty during incident, Supervisors, Policy eracators, designers of care & custody, control protecton of detainees members of NYCHH Medical Team, The City Commissioner of NYC Corrections. Document filed by Adonis Betances..(rdz) Modified on 4/5/2024 (rdz) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/05 3:24 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz) |