In Re: Byju's Alpha, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew L Carter, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-00171 |
Cause | M 08-85 Motion to Quash |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Quash
Mon 04/29 9:08 AM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH NON-PARTY SUBPOENA denying as moot1 Motion to Quash. The motion of Applicants CAMSHAFT CAPITAL FUND, LP; CAMSHAFT CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC; and CAMSHAFT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC quashing Respondent's subpoena to non-party APEX FUND SERVICES dated April 4, 2024 in connection with Case Nos. 24-10140 (JTD) and 24-50013 (JTD) in the United States Bankruptcy Court For the District of Delaware in its entirety ("the Subpoena") is DENIED as moot in light of the Indiana Bankruptcy Court's April 25, 2024 decision denying the Motion to Quash. See Camshaft Capital Management, LLC et al v. Apex Fund Services (Indiana) Inc., Case No. 1:24-cv-00713-JRS-MG (S.D. Ind.). Applicants' motion for a protective order is also DENIED as moot. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the open motions at ECF No. 1 and ECF No. 20. The status conference scheduled for April 30, 3024 is canceled. The Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by April 30, 2024 on the pendency of this action. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/26/2024) (tg) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 04/26 8:25 AM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Benjamin Finestone dated April 26, 2024 re:20 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Pieter Van Tol dated April 24, 2024. LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Pieter Van Tol dated April 24, 2024. . Document filed by Byju's Alpha, Inc...(Finestone, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Apr. 25, 2024 Minute Entry, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Apr. 25, 2024 Entry | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Discovery Local Rule 37.2 Conference
Wed 04/24 8:34 PM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Pieter Van Tol dated April 24, 2024., LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Pieter Van Tol dated April 24, 2024. Document filed by Camshaft Capital Advisors, LLC, Camshaft Capital Fund, LP, Camshaft Capital Management, LLC..(Van Tol, Pieter) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 04/23 2:18 PM
ORDER: The Court will conduct a telephone status conference in this action on April 30, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Eastern Time. The Parties should contact the Court at 1-888-363-4749 (Conference Code: 3768660) on the date and time specified above. ( Telephone Conference set for 4/30/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/23/2024) (ate) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
misc
Letter
Fri 04/19 9:03 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Pieter Van Tol dated April 19, 2024 re: motion to quash. Document filed by Camshaft Capital Advisors, LLC, Camshaft Capital Fund, LP, Camshaft Capital Management, LLC..(Van Tol, Pieter) |
|
17 | 17
3
pgs
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 04/19 6:59 PM
DECLARATION of Pieter Van Tol in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoena . (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29184245). Document filed by Camshaft Capital Advisors, LLC, Camshaft Capital Fund, LP, Camshaft Capital Management, LLC..(Van Tol, Pieter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit E - Camshaft's Motion to Dismiss Debtors Chapter 11 Case in Case No. 24-10140 (JTD), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit F - Camshaft Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, to Abstain in Case No. 24-50013 (JTD), | ||
Att: 3 31 pgs Exhibit G - Appellants' Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal of Contempt Order and Preliminary Injunction in Case No. 24-cv-00358 (MN), | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit H - Deloitte Independent Auditor's Report, | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit I - September 15, 2023 Camshaft Capital Fund, LP investment details statement for Inspilearn LLC, | ||
Att: 6 9 pgs Exhibit J - Camshaft Capital Advisors LLC Valuation Policy from July 2022, | ||
Att: 7 12 pgs Exhibit K - Camshaft's Responses and Objections to Debtors First Set of Interrogatories, | ||
Att: 8 15 pgs Exhibit L - Supplemental Declaration of Riju Ravindran submitted in the Adversary Proceeding | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 04/19 6:49 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoena . (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29184245) . Document filed by Camshaft Capital Advisors, LLC, Camshaft Capital Fund, LP, Camshaft Capital Management, LLC..(Van Tol, Pieter) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 7:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jianjian Ye on behalf of Byju's Alpha, Inc...(Ye, Jianjian) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 7:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susheel Kirpalani on behalf of Byju's Alpha, Inc...(Kirpalani, Susheel) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 04/16 5:47 PM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/16/2024) (ate) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/16 5:48 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 4/19/2024. (ate) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 04/15 11:41 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Pieter Van Tol dated April 15, 2024. Document filed by Camshaft Capital Advisors, LLC, Camshaft Capital Fund, LP, Camshaft Capital Management, LLC..(Van Tol, Pieter) |
|
11 | 11
3
pgs
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/15 9:03 PM
DECLARATION of Benjamin I. Finestone in Opposition re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoena . (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29184245). Document filed by Byju's Alpha, Inc...(Finestone, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1- Contempt Order, | ||
Att: 2 25 pgs Exhibit 2- Memorandum Opinion, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Preliminary Injunction Order, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- March 29, 2024 Form ADV, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5- Protective Order, | ||
Att: 6 48 pgs Exhibit 6- Brief For Temporary Restraining Order, | ||
Att: 7 37 pgs Exhibit 7- Pohl Declaration, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8- Interrogatory Answers, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9- Preliminary Injunction Hearing Transcript, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10- Feb. 16, 2024 Hearing Transcript, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11- March 1, 2024 Hearing Transcript | ||
10 | 10
21
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/15 8:38 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoena . (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29184245) . Document filed by Byju's Alpha, Inc...(Finestone, Benjamin) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 8:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Isidore Finestone on behalf of Byju's Alpha, Inc...(Finestone, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Certificate of Service Other
Tue 04/09 1:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Camshaft Capital Advisors, LLC, Camshaft Capital Fund, LP, Camshaft Capital Management, LLC..(Herskowitz, Arthur) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur Justin Herskowitz on behalf of Camshaft Capital Advisors, LLC, Camshaft Capital Fund, LP, Camshaft Capital Management, LLC..(Herskowitz, Arthur) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth C Carter on behalf of Camshaft Capital Advisors, LLC, Camshaft Capital Fund, LP, Camshaft Capital Management, LLC..(Carter, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/08 9:49 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vba) |
||
notice
Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/08 9:50 AM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(vba) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/05 10:33 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Camshaft Capital Advisors, LLC, Camshaft Capital Fund, LP, Camshaft Capital Management, LLC..(Van Tol, Pieter) |
|
4 | 4
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 04/05 10:32 PM
DECLARATION of Pieter Van Tol in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoena . (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29184245). Document filed by Camshaft Capital Advisors, LLC, Camshaft Capital Fund, LP, Camshaft Capital Management, LLC..(Van Tol, Pieter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Communication, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Letter | ||
3 | 3
12
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 04/05 10:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoena . (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29184245) . Document filed by Camshaft Capital Advisors, LLC, Camshaft Capital Fund, LP, Camshaft Capital Management, LLC..(Van Tol, Pieter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Quash Non-Party Subpoena | ||
2 | 2
misc
Miscellaneous Cover Sheet
Fri 04/05 10:21 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Van Tol, Pieter) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Quash
Fri 04/05 10:19 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoena . (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29184245)Document filed by Camshaft Capital Advisors, LLC, Camshaft Capital Fund, LP, Camshaft Capital Management, LLC.(Van Tol, Pieter) |