Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Paul C Huck
Referred: Ch Magistrate Judge Edwin G Torres
Case #: 1:24-cv-20729
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseMotion to enforce deposition subpoena
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2024
Terminated:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 7:55 AM EDT
Petitioner
Nina Agdal
Represented By
Jason Mays
Marcus Neiman Rashbaum & Pineiro
contact info
Jeffrey Adam Neiman
Marcus Neiman & Rashbaum LLP
contact info
Respondent
Joshua Wander
Represented By
Stacy Jaye Rodriguez
Actuate Law LLC
contact info
James J Ward
Actuate Law, LLC
contact info
Jordan Estes
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Dara Chevlin Tarkowski
Actuate Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 08/15 7:42 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Closing Case. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 8/14/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/12 2:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING JORDAN ESTES' MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING granting30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Jordan Estes. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 7/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
30 30 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 07/11 10:30 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jordan Estes. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17669209 by Joshua Wander. Responses due by 7/25/2024.(Rodriguez, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Tue 06/18 12:02 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Entry of Discovery Order. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (EGT)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs motion Discovery Tue 06/18 8:00 AM
Joint MOTION for Discovery Order by Respondent Joshua Wander and by Nina Agdal. Responses due by 7/2/2024.(Mays, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 17, 2024
27 27 notice NOTICE of HEARING (or CANCELLATION) Mon 06/17 11:45 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER cancelling this week's discovery hearing upon notification from the parties that the issues can be resolved through a stipulated order. On or before June 19, 2024, the parties shall file a "Joint Motion for Entry of Discovery Order" that includes a proposed order resolving the relevant issues. The parties shall additionally email a copy of this proposed order in Word format to the undersigned's chambers. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. (elk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion for Hearing Wed 05/22 2:16 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting25 motion for hearing. A discovery hearing is set for 6/20/2024 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. The hearing will take place in person at the United States Courthouse, 99 N.E. Fourth Street, Tenth Floor, Courtroom Five, Miami, Florida. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/22/2024. (elk)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs motion Hearing Wed 05/22 12:12 PM
MOTION for Hearing by Nina Agdal. (Mays, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Compliance Fri 04/05 10:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re 22 Order directing the Clerk of Court to re-designate this matter as a contested civil case for statistical purposes. Case re-designated as a civil matter. (pes)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Miscellaneous Case - Contested Fri 04/05 9:31 AM
PAPERLESS Order directing the Clerk of Court to re-designate this matter as a contested civil case for statistical purposes Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 4/5/2024. (mzn)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Fri 04/05 9:30 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address and email information as submitted through attorney's PACER account for attorney James J. Ward re20 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
20 20 2 pgs NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by James J Ward (Ward, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
24 24 misc Transcript Fri 04/05 12:39 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2024 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres, 1-25 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, jemancari@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/24/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2024. (apz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
19 19 ORDER Granting18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Dara C. Tarkowski. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 4/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
18 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Dara C. Tarkowski. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17412541 by Joshua Wander. Responses due by 4/15/2024.(Rodriguez, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, March 28, 2024
17 17 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Discovery Hearing held on 3/28/2024. Attorney Appearance(s): Jeffrey Adam Neiman, Jason Mays, Stacy Jaye Rodriguez, James J Ward. (Digital 10:41:21) Total time in court: 34 minutes. (mdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
16 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear via telephone for hearing on motion to compel. Counsel shall be on a landline and may not appear on speakerphone or cellular telephone. Further call-in instructions for appearance will be provided. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 3/26/2024. (EGT)
Related: [-]
15 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear to Hold Telephonic Hearing on the Motion to Compel and Motion too File Under Seal by Joshua Wander. Responses due by 4/9/2024. (Ward, James)
Related: [-]
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 14 restricted/sealed until further notice. (925860)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
13 13 Clerk's NOTICE of Compliance re 12 Order on Motion to Seal, DEs 1 and 10 sealed. (pcs)
Related: [-]
12 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting4 Respondent's motion to seal. Although the motion is procedurally deficient, the Court has set a hearing on Petitioner's motion to compel and therefore good causes exists to seal the briefing on the motion to compel until the issues raised therein can be addressed at the hearing. Accordingly, the Clerk is instructed to seal Petitioner's motion to compel and its exhibits, [D.E. 1], as well as Petitioner's response in opposition and its exhibits, [D.E. 10], until further notice. Should Petitioner file a reply in support of her motion to compel, that reply and its exhibits shall also be filed under seal. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 3/22/2024. (elk)
Related: [-]
11 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 motion for hearing. A discovery hearing is set for 3/28/2024 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. The hearing will take place in person at the United States Courthouse, 99 N.E. Fourth Street, Tenth Floor, Courtroom Five, Miami, Florida. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 3/22/2024. (elk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 10 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
9 9 MOTION for Hearing re 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Nina Agdal.(Mays, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, March 04, 2024
8 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion (ECF No. 1) per Local Rule 5.4 filed by Nina Agdal. Replies due by 3/11/2024. (Mays, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
7 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Motions [ECF Nos. 1, 5] are hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for disposition. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 2/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
6 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James J Ward on behalf of Joshua Wander. Attorney James J Ward added to party Joshua Wander (pty:res). (Ward, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs NOTICE of Petitioner's Position by Joshua Wander re4 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion (ECF No. 1) per Local Rule 5.4 (Rodriguez, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
4 4 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Motion (ECF No. 1) per Local Rule 5.4 by Joshua Wander. (Rodriguez, Stacy)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacy Jaye Rodriguez on behalf of Joshua Wander. Attorney Stacy Jaye Rodriguez added to party Joshua Wander (pty:res). (Rodriguez, Stacy)
Related: [-]
2 2 Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck (nwn)
Related: [-]
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 1 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pcs)
Related: [-]