MERITOR HEAVY VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC v. Danfoss Power Solutions Co.
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Terrence G Berg |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-10886 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 1:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Danfoss Power Solutions Co.
|
|
Plaintiff
MERITOR HEAVY VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Tue 04/16 9:02 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Danfoss Power Solutions Co. waiver sent on 4/8/2024, answer due 6/7/2024. (Ellis, Nicholas) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Thu 04/11 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M. Loew on behalf of Meritor Heavy Vehicle Systems, LLC. (Loew, Lauren) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Thu 04/11 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond McVeigh on behalf of Meritor Heavy Vehicle Systems, LLC. (McVeigh, Raymond) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued*
Mon 04/08 10:37 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Danfoss Power Solutions Co.* (JHea) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Mon 04/08 10:37 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (JHea) |
||
Sunday, April 07, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Sun 04/07 1:08 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by MERITOR HEAVY VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cummins, Inc. for MERITOR HEAVY VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC. (Ellis, Nicholas) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
29
pgs
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Fri 04/05 7:37 PM
COMPLAINT filed by MERITOR HEAVY VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC against Danfoss Power Solutions Co. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9740839 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for Colorado, 1:24-cv-00880, Judge Gallagher ] (Ellis, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 |