SANTOS et al v. REVIVA LABS, INC.
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Arthur J Schwab |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00097 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
REVIVA LABS, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
KAREN CLAYTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SYLVIA SANTOS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
6
pgs
order
Order of Consolidation (Docket on Member Case Only)
Thu 04/18 12:03 PM
Order of Consolidation. This case is consolidated with 2:24-cv-489, the lead case. All pleadings, Motions and other papers hereafter filed shall be filed at 2:24-cv-489. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/18/2024. (lar) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 9:39 AM
Summons Issued as to REVIVA LABS, INC. (rtm) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 04/09 9:36 AM
Judge Arthur J. Schwab Presiding. (rtm) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Fri 04/05 6:10 PM
COMPLAINT against REVIVA LABS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8202957), filed by SYLVIA SANTOS, KAREN CLAYTON. (Sweet, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |