FOREMAN et al v. CROWN MAPLE, LLC
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Arthur J Schwab |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00098 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
CROWN MAPLE, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
KAREN CLAYTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ERIC FOREMAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
6
pgs
order
Order of Consolidation (Docket on Member Case Only)
Thu 04/18 12:05 PM
Order of Consolidation. This case is consolidated with 2:24-cv-489, the lead case. All pleadings, Motions and other papers hereafter filed shall be filed at 2:24-cv-489. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/18/2024. (lar) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 1:14 PM
Summons Issued as to CROWN MAPLE, LLC (cel) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 04/09 1:05 PM
Judge Susan Paradise Baxter no longer assigned to case. (cel) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 04/09 1:08 PM
Judge Arthur J. Schwab added. (cel) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 04/08 4:01 PM
Judge Susan Paradise Baxter added. (cel) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Fri 04/05 8:00 PM
COMPLAINT against CROWN MAPLE, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8202985), filed by ERIC FOREMAN, KAREN CLAYTON. (Sweet, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |