Safety Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone LLC
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret R Guzman |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-10863 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Worcester Superior Court, 2485CV00266 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2024 4:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Broan-NuTone LLC
926 W. State Street
Hartford, WI 53027 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Safety Insurance Company
as Subrogee of Keith Kopley 20 Custom House Street
Boston, MA 02109 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
State Court Record - no answer filed in state court
Wed 04/24 1:21 PM
STATE COURT Record. (Duggan, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/10 2:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Broan-NuTone LLC.(Duggan, Christopher) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Fri 04/05 8:41 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 04/05 8:40 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Margaret R. Guzman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer
Fri 04/05 8:37 AM
Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 4/5/2024 Case Number 1:24-cv-10863. (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (McManus, Caetlin) | |
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broan-NuTone LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-NuTone LLC.. (Duggan, Christopher) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Broan-NuTone LLC ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10349458 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Duggan, Christopher) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, summons, complaint, cover sheet, tracking order, uniform counsel cert. for civil cases, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form |