Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Sheryl H Lipman
Referred: Charmiane G Claxton
Case #: 2:24-cv-02219
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 3:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Janice Atkins
Defendant
Prologistix
Plaintiff
Tekeva Shaw
966 Looney Avenue
Memphis, TN 38107

GPO Apr 23 2024
ORDER Granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tekeva Shaw, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Tekeva Shaw ( Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 4/23/2024. (Claxton, Charmiane)
GPO May 23 2024
ORDER MODIFYING AND ADOPTING 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/23/2024. (shl)

Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Thursday, May 23, 2024
8 8 order Judgment Thu 05/23 11:32 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/23/2024. (shl)
Related: [-]
7 7 6 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Thu 05/23 11:30 AM
ORDER MODIFYING AND ADOPTING6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/23/2024. (shl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 motion Report and Recommendations Order Tue 04/23 7:13 PM
ORDER Granting2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tekeva Shaw, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Tekeva Shaw ( Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 4/23/2024. (Claxton, Charmiane)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
misc Clerks Referral to Magistrate Judge Fri 04/12 1:28 PM
Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
5 5 notice ADR Compliance Fri 04/05 2:15 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Fri 04/05 2:15 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice LR 16.2 Fri 04/05 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/05 2:14 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tekeva Shaw. (csf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Fri 04/05 2:11 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 2000ra against All Defendants, filed by Tekeva Shaw.(csf)
Related: [-]