Legendary Staffing, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Scott C Clarkson |
Case #: | 8:24-bk-10875 |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 15, 2024 |
Dismissed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Debtor
Legendary Staffing, Inc.
8101 E Kaiser Blvd Ste 130
Anaheim, CA 92808-2261 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Karen S Naylor (TR)
Karen Sue Naylor, Trustee 4910 Birch Street, Suite 120
Newport Beach, CA 92660 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Docket last updated: 04/06/2024 12:35 AM PDT |
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 04/05 5:34 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:8:24-bk-10875] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56707748. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Legendary Staffing, Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 04/19/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/19/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/19/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/19/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/19/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/19/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 04/19/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/19/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 04/19/2024. (Spector, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/15/2024 at 11:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |