Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00729
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 2:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Pedro Alvarez-Tirado (2)
Represented By
Sostenes Mireles, II
The Law Office Of Sostenes Mireles Ii, PLLC
contact info
Thomas P. Moore
Law Office Of Thomas P. Moore
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Guevara (1)
Represented By
Juan Neri, III
Office Of Federal Public Defender
contact info
Material Witness
Hector Hugo Munoz-Murillo
Represented By
Jesse R. Coronado
Law Offices Of Jesse R. Coronado
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brett Chappy Miner
Usao
contact info
Matt Ian Kass
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 9:18 PM CDT
Thursday, March 07, 2024
Arrest of Pedro Alvarez-Tirado (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Kevin Guevara (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 03/07/2024 as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Kevin Guevara, Pedro Alvarez-Tirado. (ccl) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Kevin Guevara (1), Pedro Alvarez-Tirado (2); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Kevin Guevara (1), Pedro Alvarez-Tirado (2) by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ccl) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 03/07/2024 as to Kevin Guevara. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Kevin Guevara and Pedro Alvarez-Tirado. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Kevin Guevara. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Kevin Guevara held on 3/8/2024 ( Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 3/13/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova,), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Kevin Guevara (Court Reporter FTR Gold C. Levrie.) (ccl) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
5 5 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado held on 3/8/2024 ( Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 3/13/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova,), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado (Court Reporter FTR Gold C. Levrie.) (ccl) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Attorney Thomas P. Moore for Pedro Alvarez-Tirado appointed. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Kevin Guevara; Attorney Juan Neri, III for Kevin Guevara appointed.. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
9 9 Order Appointing Counsel for Material Witness Hector Hugo Munoz-Murillo in case as to Kevin Guevara, Pedro Alvarez-Tirado; Appointment of Attorney Jesse R. Coronado for Hector Hugo Munoz-Murillo. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
10 10 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance for Material Witness Hector Hugo Munoz-Murillo in case as to Kevin Guevara, Pedro Alvarez-Tirado held on 3/11/2024 SPANISH Language Interpreter required. (Court Reporter FTR Gold- A Aldrete.)(ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
11 11 AFFIDAVIT for Material Witness Hector Hugo Munoz-Murillo in case as to Kevin Guevara, Pedro Alvarez-Tirado. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Material Witness Video Deposition Hector Hugo Munoz-Murillo in case as to Kevin Guevara, Pedro Alvarez-Tirado; The deposition will take place in Courtroom 1, United States Federal Courthouse, 111 E. Broadway, Del Rio, Texas on MAY 8, 2024 at 10:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
8 8 4 pgs MOTION to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Kevin Guevara. (Neri, Juan) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs ORDER GRANTING8 Motion to Continue as to Kevin Guevara (1) Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing RESET for 3/20/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Bond by Pedro Alvarez-Tirado. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
14 14 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado held on 3/13/2024, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado (Court Reporter FTR Gold- A Aldrete.) (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL; ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Bond set to NO BOND as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado (2); DENYING ORAL Motion for Bond as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado (2). Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
16 16 4 pgs MOTION to Substitute by Pedro Alvarez-Tirado. (Mireles, Sostenes) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs ORDER SETTING as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado, Motion to Substitute Hearing in case as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado16 MOTION to Substitute . Motion to Substitute Hearing set for 3/20/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (aa) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
Attorney Sostenes Mireles, II for Pedro Alvarez-Tirado added (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
Attorney Thomas P. Moore terminated as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Bond by Kevin Guevara. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Kevin Guevara. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs NOTICE Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights by Kevin Guevara (Neri, Juan) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
19 19 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing as to Kevin Guevara held on 3/20/2024 (Court Reporter FTR Gold- MG Cienega.) (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
21 21 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Motion to Substitute Hearing as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado held on 3/20/2024 (Court Reporter FTR Gold- MG Cienega.) (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs ORDER GRANTING16 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado (2). Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL; ORDER DENYING ORAL Motion for Bond as to Kevin Guevara (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Bond set to NO BOND as to Kevin Guevara (1). Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-00648-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
24 24 3 pgs INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Kevin Guevara (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Pedro Alvarez-Tirado (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
26 26 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Kevin Guevara (bot2)
Related: [-]
27 27 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Pedro Alvarez-Tirado (bot2)
Related: [-]