Weinberg Properties LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:24-bk-31318
Lead case is: 3:24-bk-31318
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-31319 |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Weinberg Properties LLC
1909 Grove Ave
Richmond, VA 23220-4507 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Gerard R. Vetter
Office of the US Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Ste. 4304
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Fri 04/26 12:14 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
31 | 31
court
Hearing Cancelled
Thu 04/25 9:51 AM
Hearing Cancelled (Lazo, Tatiana) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Thu 04/25 12:14 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
29 | 29
answer
Small Business: Declaration of No Small Business Documents Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1116(1)(B)
Wed 04/24 9:36 PM
Declaration of No Balance Sheet,No Statement of Operation,No Cash Flow Statement,No Federal Income Tax Return Filed, filed by James E. Kane of Kane & Papa, PC on behalf of Weinberg Properties LLC. (Kane, James) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists
Wed 04/24 9:35 PM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists filed by James E. Kane of Kane & Papa, PC on behalf of Weinberg Properties LLC. (Kane, James) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order Extending Time to File Lists Schedules and/or Statements; and Hearing Thereon
Tue 04/23 10:50 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Lists Schedules and/or Statements LBR 1007-1; and Hearing Thereon. Incomplete Filings due by 4/25/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2024 at 12:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Lazo, Tatiana) |
|
26 | 26
court
Hearing Cancelled
Tue 04/23 10:42 AM
Hearing Cancelled (Lazo, Tatiana) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extend Time to File Lists Schedules and/or Statements
Mon 04/22 11:12 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Lists, Schedules and/or Statements filed by James E. Kane of Kane & Papa, PC on behalf of Weinberg Properties LLC. (Kane, James) |
|
24 | 24
order
Conditioning Rights of Debtor In Possession
Mon 04/22 4:04 PM
Consent Order Conditioning Rights of Debtor In Possession (Lazo, Tatiana) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Exhibit
Thu 04/18 1:46 PM
Exhibit B (Engagement Agreement) filed by James E. Kane of Kane & Papa, PC on behalf of Weinberg Properties LLC. (Kane, James) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Joint Administration
Thu 04/18 10:20 AM
Motion for Joint Administration with FRANKLIN REALTY VENTURES LLC, 2431318KRH; THE W COMPANY LLC, 2431320KRH filed by James E. Kane of Kane & Papa, PC on behalf of Weinberg Properties LLC. (Kane, James) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Employ
Thu 04/18 10:17 AM
Application to Employ James E. Kane as Attorney filed by James E. Kane of Kane & Papa, PC on behalf of Weinberg Properties LLC. (Kane, James) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Sat 04/13 12:12 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure
Fri 04/12 12:14 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure (Admin.) |
|
18 | 18
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors
Fri 04/12 12:14 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Admin.) |
|
17 | 17
plan
CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 3015-1 Deficiency
Fri 04/12 12:14 AM
Notice of LBR 3015-1 Deficiency (Admin.) |
|
16 | 16
court
Hearing Cancelled
Thu 04/11 9:40 AM
Hearing Cancelled (Avery, Demetria) |
|
15 | 15
court
Entered in Error to Wrong Case Number: See entry
Thu 04/11 9:36 AM
Entered in Error: See entry (Manley, Candace) |
|
14 | 14
court
Entry Modification Made: See entry
Thu 04/11 7:47 AM
Entry Modification Made: See entry (Manley, Candace) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency
Thu 04/11 12:16 AM
Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
order
Designation
Wed 04/10 2:45 PM
Order of Designation; designating Lee A Barnes, Jr. to perform duties imposed upon the debtor by the Bankruptcy Code (Douglass, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Tue 04/09 12:59 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing. A copy of this document was mailed by first class mail postage prepaid to Internal Revenue Service, P. O. Box 7346, Philadelphia, PA 19101-7346 and U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission, Office of Reorganization, 950 East Paces Ferry Road, Suite 900, Atlanta, GA 30326-1382 required by the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rules. (Avery, Demetria) |
|
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/09 12:58 PM
Scheduling Order. Status Conference scheduled 7/10/2024 at 12:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Avery, Demetria) |
|
9 | 9
court
3016-1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Deficiency
Tue 04/09 12:53 PM
LBR 3016-1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 7/8/2024. Hearing scheduled for 7/10/2024 at 12:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Avery, Demetria) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Forms Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors
Tue 04/09 12:52 PM
Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Trustee Peter J. Barrett, Subchapter V Trustee added to the case. 341 meeting to be held on 5/2/2024 at 02:00 PM at Richmond Division (11): Office of the U.S. Trustee, Telephonic meeting - see notice for details. Proof of Claims due by 6/17/2024. Complaint for Determination of Dischargeability of Debt due by 7/1/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/4/2024. (Avery, Demetria) |
|
7 | 7
court
Deficient Filing Notice Request No VS Gorman
Tue 04/09 9:17 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to James E. Kane, Esq. regarding: Not accompanied by corporate resolution; and Hearing Thereon. Document(s) due by 4/23/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/8/2024 at 12:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Avery, Demetria) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
court
1 - Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
Mon 04/08 2:43 PM
LBR 1007-1 Schedule(s) and/or Statement Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Incomplete Filings due by 4/22/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/8/2024 at 12:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Avery, Demetria) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
trustee
Appointment of Trustee
Mon 04/08 2:01 PM
Appointment of Trustee with Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee Filed by Kathryn R. Montgomery of Office of the United States Trustee on behalf of Gerard R. Vetter (Montgomery, Kathryn) |
|
4 | 4
court
Entry Modification Made: See entry
Mon 04/08 1:20 PM
Entry Modification Made to add Subchapter V and Non-Individual designations to docket text: See entry (Sheridan, Michelle) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/08 9:03 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kathryn R. Montgomery of Office of the United States Trustee on behalf of Gerard R. Vetter. (Montgomery, Kathryn) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Sun 04/07 1:36 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11([LINK 24-31319 ) [caseupld,5001] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A36116607, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
caseupld
Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 - Case Upload
Sun 04/07 1:34 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 filed by James E. Kane of Kane & Papa, PC on behalf of Weinberg Properties LLC (Kane, James) |