Moonsammy et al v. Banks et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02616 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 20:1400 IDEA: Individuals With Disabilities Education Act (short title) |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
David C. Banks
|
|
Defendant
NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
|
|
Plaintiff
Cindy Moonsammy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kemraj Moonsammy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 04/29 5:24 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Eric Teszler dated April 29, 2024. Document filed by David C. Banks, New York City Department Of Education,..(Teszler, Eric) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/26 9:15 AM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Nunc Pro Tunc to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 9) addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Eric Teszler.,9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause . GRANTED. Plaintiffs' reply is due May 6, 2024. SO ORDERED. Replies due by 5/6/2024. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/25/2024) (tg) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/24 4:35 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Nunc Pro Tunc to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 9) addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Eric Teszler. Document filed by David C. Banks, New York City Department Of Education,..(Teszler, Eric) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Thu 04/18 3:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Complaint, Summons, Exhibits, Memorandum of Law, Hon. Judge Engelmayer's Order, and Civil Docket served on David c. Banks, New York City Department of Education on April 16, 2024 & April 18, 2024. Document filed by Cindy Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.), Cindy Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.)..(Raquib, Ataur) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Memorandum of Law, and Judge Engelmayer's Order on Defendants, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Proof of Service of Civil Docket on Defendants | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric M. Teszler on behalf of David C. Banks, New York City Department Of Education,..(Teszler, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Tue 04/16 9:49 AM
ORDER with respect to9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court has received a motion for preliminary injunction in the above-captioned case. Dkt. 9. Defendants have not yet appeared in this action. Plaintiffs are instructed to serve on defendants, by April 23, 2024, the complaint, summons, motion for preliminary injunction, and this order on defendants, and to file on the docket of this case forthwith an affidavit of service attesting to as much. Defendants are instructed to respond to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction within seven days of receiving such documents. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/16/2024) (va) |
|
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Tue 04/16 8:47 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:23-cv-10491-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Tue 04/16 8:48 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(tro) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/16 8:49 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro) |
||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
Tue 04/16 12:00 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. 8 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 04/12 9:48 PM
DECLARATION of Ataur Raquib in Support re:9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause .. Document filed by Cindy Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.), Cindy Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.)..(Raquib, Ataur) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's DPC filed December 6, 2023 (Redacted) | ||
9 | 9
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Fri 04/12 9:45 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Support of Proposed Order to Show Cause . Document filed by Cindy Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.), Cindy Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.)..(Raquib, Ataur) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief
Fri 04/12 9:43 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Cindy Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.), Cindy Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.)..(Raquib, Ataur) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 1:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Raquib, Ataur) |
|
6 | 6
service
Acknowledgment of Service Complaints
Mon 04/08 1:07 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint,, served. David C. Banks served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024; New York City Department Of Education, served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Document filed by Kemraj Moonsammy(Individually); Cindy Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.); Cindy Moonsammy(Individually); Kemraj Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.)..(Raquib, Ataur) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 11:34 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David C. Banks, New York City Department Of Education,..(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/08 11:22 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/08 11:22 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Mon 04/08 11:23 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 23cv10491 (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Mon 04/08 11:23 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ataur Raquib. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 11:23 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Ataur Raquib to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc) |
||
Saturday, April 06, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Sat 04/06 2:31 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David C. Banks, New York City Department of Education, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Cindy Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.), Cindy Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.)..(Raquib, Ataur) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Related Case Affidavit/Affirmation
Sat 04/06 2:24 AM
RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Ataur Raquib re: that this action be filed as related to 23-cv-10491. Document filed by Cindy Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.), Cindy Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.)..(Raquib, Ataur) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Sat 04/06 2:20 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Raquib, Ataur) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 04/06 2:15 AM
COMPLAINT against David C. Banks, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29184493)Document filed by Kemraj Moonsammy(Individually), Cindy Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.), Cindy Moonsammy(Individually), Kemraj Moonsammy(as Parents and Natural Guardians of A.M.)..(Raquib, Ataur) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit FOFD in IHO Case No. 240516, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit SRO Decision No. 23-102, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A.M.'s iBRAIN Enrollment Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A.M.'s Special Transportation Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A.M.'s Nursing Agreement |