McClure v. Trans Union LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William P Dimitrouleas |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60547 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 1:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
PNC Bank, N.A.
|
|
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Adams McClure
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 04/26 3:10 PM
ORDER GRANTING11 DEFENDANT TRANS UNION, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S1 COMPLAINT: Defendant Trans Union, LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 30, 2024. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/26 1:42 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC (Long, Charlotte) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 04/26 1:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Trans Union LLC. Attorney Charlotte Ann Long added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft).(Long, Charlotte) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 04/22 10:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PNC BANK, N.A.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT,granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document PNC Bank, N.A.. Response/Answer due 5/28/2024. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 04/19 3:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by PNC Bank, N.A.. Attorney Kimberly Held Israel added to party PNC Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Israel, Kimberly) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/11 1:57 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christopher Adams McClure. Trans Union LLC served on 4/9/2024, response/answer due 4/30/2024. (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Wed 04/10 8:13 AM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/9/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/09 1:13 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christopher Adams McClure. PNC Bank, N.A. served on 4/9/2024, response/answer due 4/30/2024. (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions
Mon 04/08 2:19 PM
Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Christopher Adams McClure (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 2:18 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Christopher Adams McClure (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 10:05 AM
Summons Issued as to PNC Bank, N.A., and Trans Union LLC. (wce) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/08 10:02 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/07 9:20 PM
COMPLAINT against PNC Bank, N.A., Trans Union LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17427891, filed by Christopher Adams McClure.(Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons TU, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) Proposed Summons PNC |