Gonzalez v. 301 PALM PLAZA, LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kathleen M Williams |
Referred: | Jonathan Goodman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21288 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 1:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
301 PALM PLAZA, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jesus Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/16 4:28 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jesus Gonzalez. 301 PALM PLAZA, LLC served on 4/11/2024, response/answer due 5/2/2024. (Leal, Alberto) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Response/Reply (Other)
Mon 04/08 10:29 AM
First RESPONSE to order Requiring Verified Certificate of Counsel by Jesus Gonzalez. (Leal, Alberto) |
|
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Mon 04/08 9:59 AM
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES IN ADA CASES. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for all Discovery Disputes and Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/8/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 8:28 AM
Summons Issued as to 301 PALM PLAZA, LLC. (cds) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/08 8:25 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/07 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT against 301 PALM PLAZA, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17427822, filed by Jesus Gonzalez.(Leal, Alberto) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |