XU v. Mayorkas et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon S Tigar |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-02095 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 1:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
UR MENDOZA JADDOU
|
|
Defendant
Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Department of Homeland Security 2707 Martin Luther King Jr. Avenue SE
Washington, DC 20528 |
|
Defendant
US Citizenship and Immigration Services
|
|
Defendant
US Department of Homeland Security
450 Golden Gate Avenue 11th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
|
Plaintiff
MIN XU
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/11 12:10 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Min Xu.. (Zhou, Mei) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Wed 04/10 10:12 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect PDF attached. Wrong case number.[err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Min Xu (msr, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 04/09 11:36 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Min Xu Zhou, Mei (Zhou, Mei) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/09 12:37 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Min Xu.. (Zhou, Mei) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 5:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Emilia M. Bardini, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Department of Homeland Security. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
order
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order
Mon 04/08 5:31 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/08 11:04 AM
Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Sun 04/07 2:22 PM
Proposed Summons. (Zhou, Mei) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Sun 04/07 2:21 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by MIN XU Zhou, Mei . (Zhou, Mei) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/07 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT Min Xu against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19297344.). Filed by MIN XU.(Zhou, Mei) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit |