5
|
|
5
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 04/24 1:35 PM
Affidavit of Service upon Joel Dahl served on 4/17/2024, answer due on 5/8/2024 Filed by S. R.. (Templeton, Emily)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 3:08 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Joel Dahl. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Mon 04/08 3:05 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/6/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/5/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 9/5/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
5
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/08 1:03 PM
Case Management Order signed on 4/8/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 04/06 2:42 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9358014 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by S. R. against Joel Dahl. (Fuller, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
Proposed Summons
|