Kraft v. The Arena Group Holdings Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis J Liman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02619 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332df Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 9:06 AM EDT |
ADR Provider
Manoj Bhargava
|
|
ADR Provider
Andrew Q Kraft
|
Represented By
|
ADR Provider
The Arena Group Holdings Inc.
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Sunday, April 21, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Sun 04/21 10:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Arena Group Holdings Inc. waiver sent on 4/10/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. Document filed by Andrew Q Kraft..(Filosa, Anthony) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 12:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Manoj Bhargava, The Arena Group Holdings Inc.. Document filed by Andrew Q Kraft..(Filosa, Anthony) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 9:34 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Arena Group Holdings Inc...(jgo) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 9:33 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Manoj Bhargava..(jgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Tue 04/09 9:26 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Anthony Rudy Filosa to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Tue 04/09 9:28 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anthony Rudy Filosa. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $3,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $3,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 04/09 9:29 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Anthony Rudy Filosa. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Andrew Q Kraft; The Arena Group Holdings Inc.; Manoj Bhargava. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 9:31 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 9:32 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 9:32 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/08 8:30 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Manoj Bhargava, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrew Q Kraft..(Filosa, Anthony) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/08 8:29 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Arena Group Holdings Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrew Q Kraft..(Filosa, Anthony) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 8:20 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Filosa, Anthony) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 8:17 AM
COMPLAINT against Andrew Q Kraft. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29184868)Document filed by Andrew Q Kraft..(Filosa, Anthony) |