New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:24-cv-02620
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 8:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Downeast Outfitters, Inc.
Represented By
Stephanie Lamerce
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Karim
Represented By
Gabriel Levy
Gabriel A. Levy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, July 11, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Thu 07/11 5:44 PM
ORDER It has been reported to the Court that the parties in this case have reached a settlement agreement. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within forty-five (45) days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/11/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 07/10 8:38 AM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/09 11:09 AM
ORDER On June 4, 2024, I granted Defendant's request for a 30-day extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Doc. 8.) On June 20, 2024, I granted Defendants second request for a 14-day extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Doc. 10.) In light of Defendants extension requests, Defendants responsive pleading was due on July 3, 2024. To date, Defendant has not responded to the complaint. Plaintiff, however, has taken no action to prosecute this case. Accordingly, if Plaintiff intends to seek a default judgment, she is directed to do so in accordance with Rule 4(H) of my Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases by no later than Tuesday, July 23, 2024. If Plaintiff fails to do so or otherwise demonstrate that she intends to prosecute this litigation, I may dismiss this case for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/9/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 06/20 1:45 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint to July 3, 2024 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Stephanie Lamerce, Esq. dated June 18, 2024. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/20/2024) Downeast Outfitters, Inc. answer due 7/3/2024 (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 06/18 6:41 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint to July 3, 2024 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Stephanie Lamerce, Esq. dated June 18, 2024. Document filed by Downeast Outfitters, Inc...(Lamerce, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 06/04 1:32 PM
ORDER granting7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Stephanie Lamerce, Esq. dated May 20, 2024. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED.1 Complaint. Downeast Outfitters, Inc. answer due 6/19/2024. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/4/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/20 2:15 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Stephanie Lamerce, Esq. dated May 20, 2024. Document filed by Downeast Outfitters, Inc...(Lamerce, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulation
Monday, April 29, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/29 10:59 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Downeast Outfitters, Inc. served on 4/26/2024, answer due 5/17/2024. Service was accepted by Ashley Rose. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/09 9:42 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Downeast Outfitters, Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 04/09 9:39 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 04/09 9:41 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 04/09 9:41 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
4 4 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Mon 04/08 10:49 AM
DECLARATION of Robert D. Moody in Support re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/08 8:58 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Downeast Outfitters, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/08 8:53 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/08 8:52 AM
COMPLAINT against Downeast Outfitters, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29184927)Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]