Karim v. TheBathOutlet, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Paul Oetken |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02625 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 10:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
TheBathOutlet, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Karim
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 8:21 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by TheBathOutlet, LLC..(Stein, David) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 8:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Stein on behalf of TheBathOutlet, LLC..(Stein, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/16 12:25 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. TheBathOutlet, LLC served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Trisha Shuhaibar. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 10:28 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TheBathOutlet, LLC..(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 10:26 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 10:27 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 10:27 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Mon 04/08 10:58 AM
DECLARATION of Robert D. Moody in Support re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/08 9:43 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TheBathOutlet, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 9:41 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Gabriel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 9:41 AM
COMPLAINT against TheBathOutlet, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29185416)Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel) |