REEVES v. Carnival Corporation
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodolfo A Ruiz, II |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21295 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 11:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Carnival Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
CHAD REEVES
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 05/01 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Nicole Genoese on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Ashley Nicole Genoese added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Genoese, Ashley) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 05/01 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter Cooper Jarnagin on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Walter Cooper Jarnagin added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Jarnagin, Walter) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/01 3:06 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. Attorney Michael J. Drahos added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Drahos, Michael) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/11 5:09 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Chad Reeves. Carnival Corporation served on 4/10/2024, response/answer due 5/1/2024. (Michaels, Todd) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 11:49 AM
Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/08 11:47 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 10:59 AM
COMPLAINT and Other Initiating Documents against Carnival Corporation. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17428822, filed by CHAD REEVES.(Michaels, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |