K.T.L. et al v. New York City Department of Education
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Analisa Torres |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02630 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 20:1415 IDEA: Challenge decision re education for handicapped |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 11:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
New York City Department of Education
|
|
Plaintiff
K.T.L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
K.T.L. on behalf of her child L.J., a minor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/22 6:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marina Moraru on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Moraru, Marina) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 04/18 4:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department of Education served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024. Service was accepted by serviceecf@law.nyc.gov. Service was made by email. Document filed by K.T.L.; K.T.L. on behalf of her child L.J., a minor..(Roller, Irina) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 11:02 AM
ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/17/2024) (va) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 10:59 AM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by June 17, 2024, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. 2. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/17/2024) (va) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 10:56 AM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by June 17, 2024, file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, on the docket. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by June 17, 2024, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/17/2024) (va) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Thu 04/11 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Lewis A. Kaplan is no longer assigned to the case..(tro) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/09 11:23 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/09 11:15 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/09 11:17 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/09 11:23 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/08 10:43 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by K.T.L., K.T.L. on behalf of her child L.J., a minor..(Roller, Irina) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 10:42 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roller, Irina) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29186149)Document filed by K.T.L., K.T.L. on behalf of her child L.J., a minor..(Roller, Irina) |