Adams v. Early Warning Services, LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William P Dimitrouleas |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60550 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 12:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Arnelle Adams
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Early Warning Services, LLC
|
Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 04/29 9:08 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Early Warning Services, LLC. Response/Answer due 5/17/2024. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/26 12:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Early Warning Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Capital One, National Association, Corporate Parent U.S. Bank National Association, Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association, Corporate Parent PNC Bank, National Association, Corporate Parent Truist Bank, Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Corporate Parent Bank of America, National Association for Early Warning Services, LLC (Williston, Gillian) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 04/26 12:21 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Early Warning Services, LLC. Attorney Gillian DiFilippo Williston added to party Early Warning Services, LLC(pty:dft).(Williston, Gillian) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 04/15 12:21 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Arnelle Adams. Early Warning Services, LLC served on 4/11/2024, response/answer due 5/2/2024. (Murphy, Robert) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Thu 04/11 4:08 PM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (amb) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions
Mon 04/08 2:37 PM
Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Arnelle Adams (Murphy, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 2:36 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Arnelle Adams (Murphy, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/08 1:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Early Warning Services, LLC. (pc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/08 1:37 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Early Warning Services, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17429274, filed by Arnelle Adams.(Murphy, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Consumer Report, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Early Warning Response, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Definations, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s) |